Snowden v. Magnolia Trace Apartments, LLC
Plaintiff: Magnolia Trace Apartments, LLC and Wanda Snowden
Case Number: 3:2019cv00476
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Dismiss as moot in light of Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 9/16/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BKA)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record. Attorney Bourgeois Willis Blake is enrolled as co-counsel for defendant Magnolia Trace Apartments, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/13/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
September 11, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Enroll Blake W. Bourgeois as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Enroll Blake W. Bourgeois as Additional Attorney by Magnolia Trace Apartments, LLC. (Hassinger, Lambert)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The scheduling conference set for 9/19/2019 is RESET for 10/31/2019 at 9:15 a.m. The joint status report is to be filed no later than 10/17/2019. On or before 10/17/2019, plaintiff(s) shall show cause, in writing, why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for plaintiff, Wanda Snowden, for counsel's failure to file the status report as directed. If the status report is filed by 10/17/2019, then no response is due from plaintiff's counsel to this order to show cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/10/2019. (SGO)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Magnolia Trace Apartments, LLC, filed by Wanda Snowden.(SWE) Modified on 9/10/2019 to edit the file date (NLT).
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Amend. The Clerk shall enter R. Doc. 6-1 into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/9/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
September 6, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 First MOTION to Amend . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #5 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wanda Snowden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Medical Records following Fall)(Washington, Christopher)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Wanda Snowden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Amendment)(Washington, Christopher) Modified on 9/6/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW).
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION to Dismiss by Magnolia Trace Apartments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Hassinger, Lambert)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 9/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/22/2019. (SGO)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Attorney Lambert J. Hassinger, Jr. regarding Blake W. Bourgeois who is Co-Counsel for party Magnolia Trace Apartments, LLC. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KAH)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Christopher J. Washington regarding La'Deisha Woods who is Co-Counsel for party Wanda Snowden. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KAH)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 684264. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1973347), filed by Magnolia Trace Apartments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Compliance, #3 List of Parties, #4 Petition for Damages, #5 Service Return on Magnolia, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4)(Hassinger, Lambert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snowden v. Magnolia Trace Apartments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magnolia Trace Apartments, LLC
Represented By: Lambert J. Hassinger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Snowden
Represented By: Christopher J. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?