Worley v. Callais Capital Management, LLC
Not Yet Classified: United States Bankruptcy Court, Middle District of Louisiana
Appellee: Callais Capital Management, LLC
Appellant: Michael Allen Worley
Case Number: 3:2019cv00489
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Appellant's BRIEF by Michael Allen Worley. (Vingiello, Arthur)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant Brief due by 9/11/2019. Appellee Brief due by 9/26/2019. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 8/8/2019. (SWE)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellant and Appellee Briefs by Callais Capital Management, LLC, Michael Allen Worley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Segrist, Peter)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Designation of Record on Appeal by United States Bankruptcy Court, Middle District of Louisiana (Attachments: #1 Docket Report, #2 Transcript of Hearing 5-22-2019)(SWE)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Briefing Schedule: Appellant Brief due by 8/12/2019. Appellee Brief due by 8/27/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 9/3/2019. (KDC)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-01021. File received, filed by Michael Allen Worley. (Attachments: #1 Judgment, #2 Notice, #3 Transmittal letter)(EDC)
July 25, 2019 Case assigned to Judge John W. deGravelles and Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worley v. Callais Capital Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: United States Bankruptcy Court, Middle District of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Callais Capital Management, LLC
Represented By: David Felicien Waguespack
Represented By: Peter J. Segrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Michael Allen Worley
Represented By: Arthur A. Vingiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?