Barre v. Milford Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Blake Barre
Defendant: Milford Casualty Insurance Company and Milwaukee Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00500
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 Notice Setting Trial and Related Deadlines: Jury Trial set for 6/21/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2021 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 5/10/2021. All other Trial deadlines are set as stated in the attached Notice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 9/17/19. (BKA)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference presently set for 9/26/2019 is cancelled. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 12/3/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 10/3/2019. Discovery due by 3/31/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 5/29/2020. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 5/29/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 7/31/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 8/14/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 9/15/2020. Motions shall be filed by 10/15/2020.The district judge will set the remaining deadlines, including dates for a pretrial conference and trial in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/16/2019. (SWE)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by Blake Barre. (Voorhies, Richard)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr.. Status Report due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/7/2019. (EDC)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal. The Clerk shall substitute R. Doc. 3 pages 3-8 in the place of R. Doc. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/9/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by Milford Casualty Insurance Company, Milwaukee Casualty Insurance Company.(Yadamec, John) Modified on 8/6/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
August 5, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal by Milford Casualty Insurance Company, Milwaukee Casualty Insurance Company. (Yadamec, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Milford Casualty Insurance Company. (KMW)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, East Baton Rouge Parish, Louisiana, Case Number C-684419. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1979066), filed by Milford Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification, #3 Notice to State Court, #4 Notice to Adverse Party, #5 Certificate of Service to Adverse Party, #6 Removal Proof of Service, #7 Corporate Disclosure, #8 Listing Pursuant to 28 USC 1447b, #9 Exhibit Ex. A State Court Record, #10 Exhibit Ex. B Medical Bills)(Yadamec, John) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/1/2019 to flatten the document. (KMW) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/13/2019 in accordance with RD 5) (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barre v. Milford Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Barre
Represented By: Jennifer Rust
Represented By: Richard P. Voorhies, III
Represented By: John Mark Fezio
Represented By: David Joseph Saltaformaggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: John Yadamec
Represented By: Ryan M. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: John Yadamec
Represented By: Ryan M. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?