Hall v. Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Louisiana
Plaintiff: Lakeisha Hall
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Louisiana
Case Number: 3:2019cv00501
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Non-Consent by Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Louisiana (Attachments: #1 Attachment 9-18-19 Filed Consent to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge)(Crochet, Vicki)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Lakeisha Hall. (Blackman, Natalie)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Louisiana.(Crochet, Vicki)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lakeisha Hall. Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Louisiana waiver sent on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Blackman, Natalie)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 9/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/9/2019. (BLR)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Louisiana. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Submitted (Blackman, Natalie) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/1/2019 to flatten the document) (KMW).
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Louisiana ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1979216.), filed by Lakeisha Hall. (Attachments: #1 Attachment cover sheet, #2 Attachment summons)(Blackman, Natalie) (Attachments 1 & 2 replaced on 8/1/2019 to flatten the documents) (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Louisiana
Represented By: Vicki M. Crochet
Represented By: Mary Lenore Feeney
Represented By: Lauren Rivera Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeisha Hall
Represented By: Natalie Shalane Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?