Arnold v. US Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Robert Arnold
Defendant: US Department of Homeland Security and Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00502
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA).(Gaupp, John)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Arnold. (Sunseri, Joseph)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Arnold. Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) served on 8/12/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Sunseri, Joseph)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Arnold. US Department of Homeland Security served on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Sunseri, Joseph)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Arnold. US Department of Homeland Security served on 8/12/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Sunseri, Joseph)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA), US Department of Homeland Security. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1979461.), filed by Robert Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Attachment)(Sunseri, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. US Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Arnold
Represented By: Joseph Douglas Sunseri
Represented By: Richard Joseph Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Represented By: Mark D. Barth
Represented By: John Joseph Gaupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?