Anderson v. Big M Transportation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kordero A Anderson and Kordero A. Anderson
Defendant: John David White and Big M Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00503
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines (court use only) (BLR)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The matter of Holmes v. Big M Transportation, Inc., et al, Civil Action 19-550-BAJ-EWD, is hereby TRANSFERRED from District Judge Brian A. Jackson to District Judge John W. deGravelles. Magistrate Judge Erin W. Doomes shall discuss with the parties during the scheduling conference if the two cases should be consolidated. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 8/28/2019. (EDC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kordero A. Anderson . John David White served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment return receipt card)(Caballero, Ricardo) Modified on 8/14/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW). Modified to edit text on 9/26/2019 (BLR).
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kordero A. Anderson . Big M Transportation, Inc. served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment return receipt card)(Caballero, Ricardo) Modified on 8/14/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW). Modified to edit text on 9/26/2019 (BLR).
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kordero A. Anderson . Big M Transportation, Inc. served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment return receipt card)(Caballero, Ricardo) Modified on 8/14/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW). Modified to edit text on 9/26/2019 (BLR).
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 9/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/9/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CLAMDC-1979980.), filed by Kordero A Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons, #3 Attachment Summons)(Caballero, Ricardo) (Attachments 1-3 replaced on 8/5/2019) (EDC). Modified on 8/5/2019 to flatten documents. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Big M Transportation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John David White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big M Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kordero A Anderson
Represented By: Ricardo A. Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kordero A. Anderson
Represented By: Ricardo A. Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?