Chembulk Trading II, LLC v. M/T Chem Ranger, et al
Plaintiff: Chembulk Trading II, LLC
Defendant: M/T Chem Ranger, in rem, Lantern Marine Co., M/T Chem Ranger and Lantern Maritime Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00513
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (SWE)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/20/2019. (SWE)
September 12, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chembulk Trading II, LLC (McNutt, Daphne) Modified on 9/12/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 09:45 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 10/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/10/2019. (SGO)
August 15, 2019 Filing 24 USM 285 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Seizure served on M/T Chem Ranger on 08/09/2019. (US Marshal, )
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Withdraw #15 Motion to Set Security. The hearing set for 8/15/2019 at 2:00 p.m. is CANCELLED. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the motion pending at docket entry 15. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/14/2019. (SWE)
August 14, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Withdraw #15 MOTION to Set Security by Lantern Maritime Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harowski, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support of #15 MOTION to Set Security filed by Lantern Maritime Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(SWE)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 MOTION for Leave to File the Supplemental Memorandum in Support of #15 MOTION to Set Security filed by Lantern Maritime Co. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/14/2019. (SWE)
August 14, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to #15 MOTION to Set Security filed by Lantern Maritime Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Order)(Harowski, Michael) Modified on 8/14/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Expedited Hearing on #15 MOTION to Set Security. In accordance with Rule E(4)(f) of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims, a Motion Hearing is set for 8/15/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/13/2019. (EDC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Set Security , and #16 MOTION for Expedited Hearing filed by Chembulk Trading II, LLC. (McNutt, Daphne) Modified on 8/13/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW).
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Expedited Hearing on #15 MOTION to Set Security by Lantern Maritime Co.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Harowski, Michael)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Set Security by Lantern Maritime Co.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Set Security, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Harowski, Michael)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Verified Statement of Right or Interest by Lantern Maritime Co. (Harowski, Michael)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Lantern Maritime Co.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (NLT)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 WARRANT In Rem issued. Submitted to the USM for Service. (NLT) Modified on 8/9/2019 to edit the text (NLT).
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 08/09/2019. (NLT)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Allow Vessel to Move. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 08/09/2019. (NLT)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 MOTION for an Order Appointing Global Maritime Security as Substitute Custodian. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 08/09/2019. (NLT)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Substitute Exhibit 2 of Verified Complaint (Doc. 1) Affidavit of Attorney Daphne P. McNutt filed by Chembulk Trading II, LLC. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 08/09/2019. (NLT)
August 9, 2019 Notice of Payment of $250.00 Bond by Chembulk Trading II, LLC. Filing fee $ 250, receipt number ALAMDC-1982846. (McNutt, Daphne)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Substitute Exhibit 2 of Verified Complaint (Doc. 1) Affidavit of Attorney Daphne P. McNutt by Chembulk Trading II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Attorney Daphne P. McNutt)(McNutt, Daphne)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for an Order Appointing Global Maritime Security as Substitute Custodian by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(McNutt, Daphne) Modified on 8/9/2019 to edit the text (NLT).
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Warrant of Arrest as to M/T CHEM RANGER regarding #2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by All Plaintiffs. (McNutt, Daphne) Modified on 8/9/2019 to edit the text (NLT).
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chembulk Trading II, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Chembulk Tankers, LLC and Chembulk Holding, LLC for Chembulk Trading II, LLC.. (McNutt, Daphne)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Allow Vessel to Move by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(McNutt, Daphne)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(McNutt, Daphne)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M/T Chem Ranger, in rem, Lantern Marine Co. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1982405.), filed by Chembulk Trading II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Attachment)(McNutt, Daphne) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/9/2019 in accordance with record document 8) (NLT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chembulk Trading II, LLC v. M/T Chem Ranger, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/T Chem Ranger, in rem, Lantern Marine Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/T Chem Ranger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lantern Maritime Co.
Represented By: Michael A. Harowski
Represented By: Alanson T. Chenault, IV
Represented By: Henry J. Rodriguez
Represented By: Antonio J. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chembulk Trading II, LLC
Represented By: Daphne P. McNutt
Represented By: William Briggs Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?