Comeaux v. Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest
Plaintiff: Gregory Comeaux
Defendant: Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest
Case Number: 3:2019cv00523
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 12/16/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 10/16/2019. Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 4/15/2020. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 5/15/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 6/15/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 7/15/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 8/14/2020. Motions shall be filed by 9/15/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/8/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 2/12/2021. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 3/5/2021. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 3/12/2021. Jury Trial set for 3/29/2021 - 4/1/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/9/2019. (SGO)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Joint STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Rimes, Robert)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 10/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/27/2019. (SGO)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest identifying Corporate Parent Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest for Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest.. (Yadamec, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Compliance by Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest (Yadamec, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number 673724. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1984075), filed by Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Pleadings, #3 Exhibit PA's Discovery Responses, #4 Verification, #5 Notice to State Court of Removal, #6 Certificate of Service to Adverse Party, #7 Proof of Service, #8 Notice to Adverse Party)(Yadamec, John) (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/13/2019 to correct page orientation) (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Comeaux v. Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Ryan M. Malone
Represented By: Jade M Wandell
Represented By: John Yadamec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Comeaux
Represented By: Randall Lee Daquanno, Jr.
Represented By: Jason Luke Melancon
Represented By: Robert C. Rimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?