Jackson v. Walmart Stores, Inc. a/k/a Walmart Louisiana, LLC
Plaintiff: Markita Oliver Jackson
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc. and Walmart Louisiana
Case Number: 3:2019cv00524
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Walmart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeRojas, Isidro)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 JOINT NOTICE of Settlement Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 14 by Markita Oliver Jackson (Walker, Tavares) Modified on 10/10/2019 to edit text. (EDC).
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The scheduling conference set for 10/16/2019 is RESET for 11/14/2019 at 2:30 p.m. The joint status report is to be filed no later than 10/31/2019. On or before 10/31/2019, plaintiff(s) shall show cause, in writing, why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for plaintiff for counsel's failure to file the status report as directed. If the status report is filed by 10/31/2019, then no response is due from plaintiff's counsel to this order to show cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/9/2019. (SGO)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 10/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/27/2019. (SGO)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd JDC, Case Number 123844. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1984092), filed by Walmart Louisiana, LLC, Walmart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(DeRojas, Isidro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Walmart Stores, Inc. a/k/a Walmart Louisiana, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Isidro Rene' DeRojas
Represented By: Sidney J. Hardy
Represented By: Peter Sinnott Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Louisiana
Represented By: Isidro Rene' DeRojas
Represented By: Sidney J. Hardy
Represented By: Peter Sinnott Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markita Oliver Jackson
Represented By: Tavares Anthony Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?