Dandridge et al v. St. Germain
Plaintiff: Delta Safety Driving School, LLC and Edward Dandridge
Defendant: Karen G. St. Germain
Case Number: 3:2019cv00529
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 11/15/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 10/23/2019. Discovery due by 6/30/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 6/1/2020. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 7/1/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 9/1/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 10/1/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 11/30/2020. Motions shall be filed by 1/12/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/7/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2021 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 6/11/2021. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 7/2/2021. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 7/16/2021. Jury Trial set for 7/26/2021 - 7/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/9/2019. (SGO) Modified on 10/9/2019 to correct motion filing date(LLH).
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Karen G. St. Germain. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Morris, Sheri)
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Schmidt, Robert)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Defendant Karen G. St. Germain is granted an extension of 21 days, or until 10/3/2019, to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
September 11, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #13 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings by Karen G. St. Germain. (Morris, Sheri) Modified on 9/11/2019 (SGO).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 10/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/27/2019. (SGO)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian A. Jackson: Telephone Conference re: Plaintiff's request for Preliminary Injunction contained in the Complaint held on 8/23/2019. Matter discussed, and as stated by the Court, matter will proceed in ordinary procedure. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward Dandridge, Delta Safety Driving School, LLC. Karen G. St. Germain served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Smith, J.)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Karen G. St. Germain. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LLH)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons for Karen G. St. Germain. The named person/entity is previously served and summons returned executed filed on 08/16/2019 into the case record. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (ELW)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Karen G. St. Germain by Edward Dandridge, Delta Safety Driving School, LLC. Karen G. St. Germain served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (Smith, J.) Modified on 8/16/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW).
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Schmidt, Robert)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel: Telephone Conference regarding Plaintiff's request for Preliminary Injunction contained in the Complaint filed in this matter is set for 8/20/2019 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall inform Counsel for the Defendant of the date and time of the Telephone Conference. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the call to Counsel for the Defendant and to Chambers at 225-389-3692. Evidence, in electronic format, shall be provided in accordance with Local Rule 79 and Administrative Procedures.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(PJH)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of 2019 08 14 Civil Cover Sheet by Edward Dandridge, Delta Safety Driving School, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Smith, J.)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons for Jeff Landry. The named person/entity is not reflected on the docket sheet as a party in the case. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (EDC)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Karen G. St. Germain. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Karen G. St. Germain ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1985046.), filed by Edward Dandridge, Delta Safety Driving School, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment)(Smith, J.) (Attachments 2 & 3 replaced on 8/14/2019) (EDC). Modified on 8/14/2019 to flatten pages. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dandridge et al v. St. Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Safety Driving School, LLC
Represented By: J. Arthur Smith, III
Represented By: Robert Moseley Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Dandridge
Represented By: J. Arthur Smith, III
Represented By: Robert Moseley Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen G. St. Germain
Represented By: Sheri M. Morris
Represented By: Christina Berthelot Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?