Carter v. State Farm Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Martin Carter
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Insurance Company, Republic Underwriters Insurance Company and Amtrust North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00539
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Consent to Removal filed by Martin Carter. (Downing, William) Modified on 9/16/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 MOTION and Order to Substitute Consent to Removal and Corporate Disclosure Statement. The clerk is directed to replace R. Doc. 10 with 12-1 and R. Doc. 11 with 12-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/6/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
September 6, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 MOTION to Substitute incorrect pleadings . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Substitute incorrect pleadings by State Farm Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Giles, Tucker)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Insurance Company (Giles, Tucker) (Main Document 11 replaced on 9/6/2019 in accordance with RD 13) (SWE).
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 Consent to Removal by State Farm Mutual Insurance Company (Giles, Tucker) (Main Document 10 replaced on 9/6/2019 in accordance with RD 13) (SWE).
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Insurance Company.(Giles, Tucker)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The #6 Motion to Substitute Notice of Removal of Civil Action Under 28 U.S.C. 1441(B) ("Diversity Jurisdiction") is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to substitute the amended Notice of Removal (R. Doc. 6, pp. 5-12) in the place of the original Notice of Removal (R. Doc. 1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/23/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
August 23, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal of Civil Action Under 28 U.S.C. 1441(B)(Diversity Jurisdiction). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Amtrust North America, Inc..(Yadamec, John)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal of Civil Action Under 28 U.S.C. 1441(B)(Diversity Jurisdiction) by Amtrust North America, Inc.. (Yadamec, John) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/23/2019 and Additional attachment(s) added to separate the documents on 8/23/2019: #1 Proposed Notice of Removal, #2 Proposed Order) (SWE).
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER: On or before 9/3/2019, Republic Underwriters Insurance Company shall file a motion to substitute the Notice of Removal with a comprehensive Amended Notice of Removal that adequately alleges the citizenship of Martin Carter, Republic Underwriters Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Insurance Company, and AmTrust North America. On or before 9/17/2019, Plaintiff shall file either: (1) a Notice stating that Plaintiff does not dispute that Republic has established the jurisdictional requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1332; or (2) a Motion to Remand. The case will be allowed to proceed if jurisdiction is adequately established. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder- Doomes on 8/20/2019. (KAH)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers. Status Report due by 10/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/19/2019. (SWE)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Republic Underwriters Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Repbulic Underwriters Insurance Company for Republic Underwriters Insurance Company.. (Yadamec, John)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Compliance by Republic Underwriters Insurance Company, (Yadamec, John) Modified on 9/4/2019 to edit text (LLH).
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number 685042. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1986826), filed by Republic Underwriters Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Medical Bills, #4 Exhibit C - Medical Records, #5 Exhibit Correspondence, #6 Verification, #7 State Court Notice of Removal, #8 Certificate of Notice to Adverse Party, #9 Proof of Service)(Yadamec, John) (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/19/2019 to correct page orientation) (KMW). (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/23/2019) (EDC). Modified on 8/23/2019 in accordance with record document 8. (EDC). Modified on 9/4/2019 to edit text (LLH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. State Farm Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: John Yadamec
Represented By: Tucker Fred Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Underwriters Insurance Company
Represented By: John Yadamec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amtrust North America, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan M. Malone
Represented By: John Yadamec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Carter
Represented By: Spencer H. Calahan
Represented By: William Tyler Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?