Alrshdan et al v. Board of Supervisors for the Southern University Agricultural and Mechanical College System
Plaintiff: Mohammed Alhashem, Hindi Alqahtani, Omar Alshahrani and Naif Alrshdan
Defendant: Board of Supervisors for the Southern University Agricultural and Mechanical College System and Board of Supervisors of Southern University and Agricultural and Mechanical College
Case Number: 3:2019cv00549
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Board of Supervisors of Southern University and Agricultural and Mechanical College. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 10/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/27/2019. (SGO)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet by Mohammed Alhashem, Hindi Alqahtani, Naif Alrshdan, Omar Alshahrani re #1 Complaint (Bianca, Dominick)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Submitted (Bianca, Dominick) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/28/2019) (EDC). Modified on 8/28/2019 to flatten document. (EDC).
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CLAMDC-1988900.), filed by Omar Alshahrani, Naif Alrshdan, Mohammed Alhashem, Hindi Alqahtani.(Bianca, Dominick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alrshdan et al v. Board of Supervisors for the Southern University Agricultural and Mechanical College System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Supervisors for the Southern University Agricultural and Mechanical College System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Supervisors of Southern University and Agricultural and Mechanical College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Alhashem
Represented By: Dominick M. Bianca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hindi Alqahtani
Represented By: Dominick M. Bianca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Alshahrani
Represented By: Dominick M. Bianca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naif Alrshdan
Represented By: Dominick M. Bianca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?