Cosey v. Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Glyndlyn Cosey
Defendant: Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC and Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00554
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER and REquest for Trial by Jury to #20 Amended Complaint by Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart, Inc..(Beard, Roy) Modified on 9/20/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW).
September 16, 2019 Filing 20 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart, Inc., filed by Glyndlyn Cosey.(KAH)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE AND ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #17 Motion to Amend Original Complaint filed by Plaintiff Glyndlyn Cosey is GRANTED, as the Motion is unopposed per R. Doc. 18, and Plaintiff has asserted good cause for the granting of the Motion in that Plaintiff seeks to correct a factual allegation involving the date of the alleged accident that is the subject of this matter. The clerk is directed to docket Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint at R. Doc. 17-1, which shall become Plaintiffs operative complaint in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/16/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
September 12, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #17 MOTION to Amend Original Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
September 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Certificate of Consultation by Glyndlyn Cosey (Snellings, Daniel)
September 12, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend Original Complaint by Glyndlyn Cosey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Snellings, Daniel)
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Amount in Controversy by Glyndlyn Cosey (Snellings, Daniel) Modified on 9/12/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of Federal Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a) filed by All Defendants. (Beard, Roy) Modified on 9/9/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Substitute Counsel. Daniel B. Snellings of Morris Bart L.L.C. be and herebysubstituted as counsel in place of John White. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/5/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE AND ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #12 Motion for Leave to Substitute the Notice of Removal with Amended Notice of Removal filed by All Defendants is GRANTED. The clerk is directed to substitute the Amended Notice of Removal at R. Doc. 12-1 in the place of R. Doc. 1, which shall become the operative Notice of Removal in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/4/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
September 3, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Leave to Substitute #1 Notice of Removal with an Amended Notice of Removal. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Substitute #1 Notice of Removal with an Amended Notice of Removal by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Proposed Order)(Beard, Roy) Modified on 9/3/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW).
August 30, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Substitute Daniel B. Snellings in place of John White as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Substitute Daniel B. Snellings in place of John White as Attorney by Glyndlyn Cosey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order granting substitution)(Hemmer, Matthew)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 10/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 08/27/2019. (ELW)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart, Inc..(Beard, Roy)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE AND ORDER: On or before 9/3/2019, defendants shall file a Motion to Substitute with comprehensive Amended Notice of Removal. On or before 9/6/2019, defendants shall file memoranda concerning amount in controversy. On or before 9/13/2019, Plaintiff shall file Notice regarding amount in controversy or Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/26/2019. (SWE)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #3 Joint Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record for failure to comply with Local Rules 5(f) and 83(b)(14). Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/26/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust. (Beard, Roy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc.. (Beard, Roy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC. (Beard, Roy)
August 26, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Substitute Daniel B. Snellings in place of John White as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Substitute Daniel B. Snellings in place of John White as Attorney by Glyndlyn Cosey. (Snellings, Daniel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Matthew Donald Hemmer regarding John White who is Co-Counsel for party Glyndlyn Cosey. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd JDC Ascension, Case Number 126158. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1989588), filed by Wal-mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, #3 Exhibit B - Service of Process Transmittal)(Beard, Roy) Modified on 9/5/2019 to replace document as per rec doc 13 (KAH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cosey v. Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust
Represented By: Roy C. Beard
Represented By: Christopher James-Lomax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Roy C. Beard
Represented By: Christopher James-Lomax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Roy C. Beard
Represented By: Christopher James-Lomax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glyndlyn Cosey
Represented By: Matthew Donald Hemmer
Represented By: Daniel Breard Snellings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?