Desselle v. State of Louisiana, Department of Transportation & Development
Plaintiff: Rhett A. Desselle
Defendant: State of Louisiana, Department of Transportation & Development
Case Number: 3:2019cv00565
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 Joint STATUS REPORT by Rhett A. Desselle. (Smith, J.)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2019 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 10/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/3/2019. (SGO)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by State of Louisiana, Department of Transportation & Development.(Keenan, Christine)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 685,668. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1992121), filed by State of Louisiana, Department of Transportation & Development. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Keenan, Christine) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/28/2019 to correct page orientation) (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desselle v. State of Louisiana, Department of Transportation & Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana, Department of Transportation & Development
Represented By: Christine S. Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhett A. Desselle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?