Dyson v. Board of Supervisors of Southern University and A&M College
Plaintiff: Alice Dyson
Defendant: Board of Supervisors of Southern University and A&M College
Case Number: 3:2019cv00598
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Protective Order . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Alice Dyson by Board of Supervisors of Southern University and A&M College. (Flanagan, Thomas)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Protective Order by Board of Supervisors of Southern University and A&M College. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Flanagan, Thomas)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(B)(6) by Board of Supervisors of Southern University and A&M College. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Flanagan, Thomas) Modified on 11/8/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 11/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/20/2019. (KAH)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alice Dyson. Board of Supervisors of Southern University and A&M College served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Wilson, Scott)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Board of Supervisors of Southern University and A&M College. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Board of Supervisors of Southern University and A&M College ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1999260.), filed by Alice Dyson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Attachment Summons)(Wilson, Scott) (Attachments 3 and 4 replaced on 9/12/2019 to flatten the documents) (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dyson v. Board of Supervisors of Southern University and A&M College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Supervisors of Southern University and A&M College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Dyson
Represented By: Scott D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?