Elias v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Julie Elias
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00599
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 Notice Setting Trial and Related Deadlines: Jury Trial set for 7/6/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2021 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 5/25/2021. All other Trial deadlines are set as stated in the attached Notice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/1/19. (BKA)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference set for 11/7/2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 12/18/2019. Discovery due by 5/1/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 5/15/2020. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 6/1/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 6/16/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 7/1/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 9/1/2020. Motions shall be filed by 10/1/2020. The district judge will set the remaining deadlines, including dates for a pretrial conference and trial in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/31/2019. (SWE)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Julie Elias. (Welborn, Jason)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDING PETITION FOR DAMAGES against USAA Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Julie Elias.(KAH) Modified on 10/16/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages filed by Julie Elias. R. Doc. 3-1 shall be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/16/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER and Defenses to Plaintiff's Petition for Damages and First Supplemental and Amending Petition by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Johnson, Mason) Modified on 10/11/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
September 20, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages by Julie Elias. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; 1st S&A Petition, #2 Proposed Pleading; Summons in a Civil Action, #3 Proposed Pleading; Original Petition)(Welborn, Jason) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/20/2019 to flatten document) (SWE).
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2019 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 10/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/17/2019. (SGO)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd JDC, Ascension Parish, Case Number 00126212B. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1999293), filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Johnson, Mason) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/12/2019 to flatten the document) (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elias v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Mason Cire Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?