Theriot v. Serrano et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Theriot
Defendant: KS Xpress, Inc., Yoisel Aguilla Serrano and National Transportation Insurance Company RRG, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00605
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by KS Xpress, Inc., National Transportation Insurance Company RRG, LLC.(Camel Begneaud, Lauren)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2020. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 11/14/2019. Discovery due by 5/1/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 5/15/2020. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 6/1/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 6/15/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 7/1/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 7/31/2020. Motions shall be filed by 9/1/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/23/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Judge John W. deGravelles. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 1/29/2021. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 2/12/2021. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 2/19/2021. Jury Trial set for 3/8/2021 - 3/12/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/8/2019. (SGO)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT by Ronald Theriot. (Aldrich, Bradley)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Ronald Theriot, filed by National Transportation Insurance Company RRG, LLC, KS Xpress, Inc..(Camel Begneaud, Lauren)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, that, on or before 9/30/2019, the removing defendant shall file an amended notice of removal providing the citizenship of plaintiff Ronald Theriot and defendants KS Xpress, Inc. and National Transportation Insurance Company, RRG, LLC by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/18/2019. (KAH)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 10/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/17/2019. (SGO)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KS Xpress, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent National Transportation Insurance Company, RRG, LLC for KS Xpress, Inc. (KAH)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 18th Judicial District Court, Case Number 79143. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2000386), filed by National Transportation Insurance Company RRG, LLC, KS Xpress, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Attachment, #6 Exhibit)(Camel Begneaud, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Theriot v. Serrano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Theriot
Represented By: Chaz Hanley Roberts
Represented By: Bradley J. Aldrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KS Xpress, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Campbell
Represented By: Lauren Alaina Camel Begneaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yoisel Aguilla Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Transportation Insurance Company RRG, LLC
Represented By: Michael Campbell
Represented By: Lauren Alaina Camel Begneaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?