D.B. v. CorrectHealth East Baton Rouge, LLC et al
Plaintiff: D.B.
Defendant: City Parish of East Baton Rouge, Sid J. Gautreaux, III and CorrectHealth East Baton Rouge, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00620
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #15 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to 12(b)(6) by Sid J. Gautreaux, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Johnston, Tara) Modified on 11/15/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
November 14, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #15 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to 12(b)(6) filed by D.B.. (KMW)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 11/13/2019. (KMW)
November 6, 2019 Filing 21 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Opposition to Defendant Sheriff's #15 Motion to Dismiss by D.B.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Proposed Order)(DeReus, Garret) Modified on 11/7/2019 to edit text (LT).
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion to Extend Response Deadline to #15 MOTION to Dismiss. The deadline is hereby continued until 11/18/2019. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/21/2019. (KAH)
October 18, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #15 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to 12(b)(6) by D.B.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeReus, Garret)
October 15, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #15 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to 12(b)(6) : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Vacating #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/15/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER : granting #15 Motion to Dismiss AND granting #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, with prejudice. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/15/2019. (ELW)
October 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Sid J. Gautreaux, III. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order for Motion to Dismiss)(Caruso, Ashley) Modified on 10/15/2019 to edit text. (EDC).
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT: Exhibit A to #10 MOTION to Proceed Using a Pseudonym (NLT) Modified on 10/10/2019 to create link (NLT).
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Under Seal. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/09/2019. (NLT)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #10 MOTION to Proceed Using a Pseudonym : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Under Seal by D.B.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Exhibit A)(Westermeier, Emily)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Proceed Using a Pseudonym by D.B.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Exhibit A)(Westermeier, Emily)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel: Scheduling Conference is reset for 1/9/2020 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/19/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Leave to Extend Deadline in which to Respond on behalf of the City/Parish of East Baton Route. City Parish of East Baton Rouge answer is due 11/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/1/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by D.B.. CorrectHealth East Baton Rouge, LLC waiver sent on 9/19/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (DeReus, Garret)
October 1, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Extend Deadline in which to Respond on Behalf of the City/Parish of East Baton Rouge . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Extend Deadline in which to Respond on Behalf of the City/Parish of East Baton Rouge by City Parish of East Baton Rouge. (Andrews, Arthur)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by D.B.. Sid J. Gautreaux, III served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (DeReus, Garret)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by D.B.. City Parish of East Baton Rouge served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (DeReus, Garret)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 11/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/23/2019. (KAH)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(LT)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City Parish of East Baton Rouge, CorrectHealth East Baton Rouge, LLC, Sid J. Gautreaux, III ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2002257.), filed by D.B.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons, #3 Attachment Summons, #4 Attachment Summons)(DeReus, Garret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.B. v. CorrectHealth East Baton Rouge, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Parish of East Baton Rouge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sid J. Gautreaux, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CorrectHealth East Baton Rouge, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.B.
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?