Gould v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, et al
Plaintiff: Shelita Gould
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Josiah Covey, Expro Americas and Expro Americas, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00625
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 Joint Status Report by Shelita Gould. (Downing, William) Modified on 10/23/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Josiah Covey, Expro Americas, LLC, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.(Cunningham, Erika)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Expro Americas, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA identifying Corporate Parent American International Group Inc, Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent Expro US Holdings, LLC for Expro Americas, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.. (Cunningham, Erika)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 11/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/1/2019. (SGO)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 67594. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2003158), filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, PA, Expro Americas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Exhibit)(Cunningham, Erika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gould v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Erika Mullenbach Cunningham
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josiah Covey
Represented By: Erika Mullenbach Cunningham
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expro Americas
Represented By: Erika Mullenbach Cunningham
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expro Americas, LLC
Represented By: Erika Mullenbach Cunningham
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelita Gould
Represented By: Spencer H. Calahan
Represented By: William Tyler Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?