Bufford v. Weston Associates Management Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Lora Bufford
Defendant: WESTON ASSOCIATES MANAGEMENT CO., INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00631
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to #1 Complaint by Weston Associates Management Co., Inc..(Carroll, James) Modified on 11/5/2019 to edit text. (EDC).
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 01:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 11/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/1/2019. (EDC)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Weston Associates Management Co., Inc. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WESTON ASSOCIATES MANAGEMENT CO., INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2004105.), filed by Lora Bufford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons)(Arruebarrena, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bufford v. Weston Associates Management Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lora Bufford
Represented By: James L. Arruebarrena
Represented By: Dale Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTON ASSOCIATES MANAGEMENT CO., INC.
Represented By: James Linus Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?