Richardson v. Landry
Petitioner: Marcus Richardson
Respondent: Jeff Landry and Darrel Vannoy
Case Number: 3:2019cv00634
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: In order for this Court to determine the action, if any, that shall be taken on this application,the District Attorney for the Parish of West Baton Rouge shall file an answer & memo of authorities, along w/copies of all briefs & memoranda. Along with the response, The District Attorney for the 18th JDC Judicial District Court shall file an electronic certified copy of the state court record, including transcripts of all proceedings held in the state courts as well as a certified electronic copy of all documents. The Clerk of Court for the 18th JDC Judicial District Court shall file, in a conventional manner, not electronic, a courtesy copy of the entire state court record filed by the state. The Clerk of this Court serve, by any means which provides tracking and delivery confirmation, a copy of the entire application & this order on the Attorney General for the State of Louisiana, the District Attorney for the Parish of West Baton Rouge, and the Clerk of Court for 18th JDC Judicial District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/15/2019. (EDC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2019: #1 Attachment) (EDC). Modified on 11/18/2019 to add routing. (EDC).
November 12, 2019 Confirmation of receipt of payment from Marcus Richardson #628267 in the amount of $5.00. Transaction posted on 11/8/2019. Receipt number 4699029851 processed by eclement. (TDA)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER : #5 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is DENIED. Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 is DENIED AS MOOT. ORDERED that, within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, Petitioner shall pay the filing fee of $5.00 to the Clerk of this Court.Filing Fee due by 10/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/10/2019. (ELW)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Marcus Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(KMW)
October 8, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Documents (Statement of Account) Returned to the Inmate for Non Compliance with Local Rule 5(e)(1). Document returned electronically and original returned via USPS (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 5) (KMW) Modified on 10/8/2019 to edit the text (NLT). (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/8/2019 to correct the order of filing) (KMW). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/8/2019: #2 Proposed Pleading;) (KMW).
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Letter of Deficiency: The Clerk has filed your new suit. However, it is deficient in the areas as stated herein. The deficiency must be corrected within the given time frame. Filing Fee due by 10/14/2019. Statement of Account due by 10/14/2019. (KAH)
September 23, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
September 23, 2019 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Marcus Richardson. (KMW)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION Under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus By a Person in State Custody, filed by Marcus Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Attachment Part 1, #3 Part 2)(KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darrel Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marcus Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?