Stevenson v. Benjamin et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Stevenson
Defendant: Kevin Benjamin and Darrell Vannoy
Case Number: 3:2019cv00637
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Confirmation of receipt of payment from CHRISTOPHER STEVENSON in the amount of $8.00. Transaction posted on 11/13/2019. Receipt number 4699029863 processed by kwilcox. (TDA)
November 5, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay the Filing Fee. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay the Filing Fee by Christopher Stevenson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Proposed Order)(KMW)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. It is ordered that the plaintiff pay an initial partial filing fee of $7.17 in accordance with 28 USC 1915. A copy of this order shall be sent to the plaintiff and to Centralized Inmate Banking. Filing Fee due by 10/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/10/2019. (SGO)
September 23, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Christopher Stevenson. (KMW)
September 23, 2019 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kevin Benjamin, Darrell Vannoy, filed by Christopher Stevenson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevenson v. Benjamin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?