State of Louisiana v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: STATE OF LOUISIANA, by and through its Attorney General, JEFF LANDRY and State Of Louisiana
Defendant: J. P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC, CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC., JEFFERIES GROUP LLC, R.W. BAIRD & CO., GOLDMAN SACHS & CO. LLC, FIRST TENNESSEE BANK, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., UNNAMED COCONSPIRATORS, CREDIT SUISSE AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Barclays Bank PLC, DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES INC., MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, FTN FINANCIAL SECURITIES CORP., Bank of America, N.A., BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC., STIFEL, MIZUHO SECURITIES, USA LLC, BNP PARIBUS SECURITIES CORP., USB SECURITIES LLC, Mizuho Securities, USA LLC, Stifel, Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc, R. W. Baird & Co., UBS Securities LLC, First Tennessee Bank, N. A., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Hilltop Holdings, Inc., HSBC Securities USA, Inc., TD Securities, LLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC., Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc. and Stifel Nicolaus & Co., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00638
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
2 Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 95 RESPONSE to #92 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages MOTION to Substitute R. Doc. 90 filed by Jefferies Group LLC, Mizuho Securities, USA LLC, R. W. Baird & Co.. (Carter, Winstol)
February 21, 2020 Filing 94 REPLY to #90 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Ferachi, Michael)
February 19, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE: Pursuant to General Order 2020-03, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(NLT)
February 14, 2020 Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits and Substitute R. Doc. 90 by State Of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Perkins, Alejandro) Modified on 2/18/2020 to edit the text (KAH).
February 11, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE with LR 7(g) as to #90 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,. REQUIRED CORRECTION: A combined Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits and Motion to Substitute the Incorrect Pleading must filed within 24 hours of this notice. Otherwise, the original filing may be stricken by the Court without further notice. (KMW)
February 7, 2020 Filing 90 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6), #87 Joinder in Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Damages, #68 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #69 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by State Of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents, #2 Table of Authorities)(Perkins, Alejandro)
February 5, 2020 Filing 89 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #88 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint for Damages filed by R. W. Baird & Co.. (Powers, Lynne)
February 4, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #88 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint for Damages. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
February 3, 2020 Filing 88 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint for Damages by State Of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading;)(Perkins, Alejandro) Modified on 2/4/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE).
January 31, 2020 Filing 87 Joinder in Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Damages filed by R. W. Baird & Co. by Stifel Nicolaus & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Memorandum in Support of Joinder in Motion to Dismiss)(Freeman, George) Modified on 1/31/2020 to edit text (LT).
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #83 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Robert Andrew Sacks is enrolled as pro hac vice co-counsel for Defendant Stifel, Nicolaus & Co., Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/31/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
January 31, 2020 Filing 85 REPLY to #69 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jefferies Group LLC, Mizuho Securities, USA LLC, R. W. Baird & Co.. (Carter, Winstol)
January 30, 2020 Filing 84 REPLY to #68 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Barclays Bank PLC. (Golden, Robert)
January 29, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #83 Ex Parte MOTION for Robert Andrew Sacks to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2066792). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
January 29, 2020 Filing 83 Ex Parte MOTION for Robert Andrew Sacks to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2066792) by Stifel Nicolaus & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration & Certificate, #2 Attachment Order)(Freeman, George)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #78 Motion to Dismiss. This action shall be Dismissed With Prejudice against Goldman Sachs as stated herein. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/21/2020. (EDC)
January 17, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #81 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
January 17, 2020 Filing 81 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by HSBC Securities USA, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC.. (Philips, Harry)
January 17, 2020 Filing 80 Summons Issued as to Stifel Nicolaus & Co., Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
January 17, 2020 Filing 79 Summons Submitted (Perkins, Alejandro)
January 15, 2020 Filing 78 MOTION to Dismiss/NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by State Of Louisiana (Attachments: #1 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice as to Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC)(Perkins, Alejandro) Modified on 1/16/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #73 , #74 , #75 , and #76 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Jonathan D. Thier, Herbert S. Washer, Samuel G. Mann, and Peter J. Linken are enrolled as pro hac vice co-counsel for Defendants Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/15/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
January 14, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #73 Ex Parte MOTION for Jonathan D. Thier to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2058561), #75 Ex Parte MOTION for Samuel G. Mann to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2058570), #76 Ex Parte MOTION for Peter J. Linken to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2058575), #74 Ex Parte MOTION for Herbert S. Washer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2058569). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
January 13, 2020 Filing 76 Ex Parte MOTION for Peter J. Linken to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2058575) by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Pleading; [Order])(Schwab, Thomas)
January 13, 2020 Filing 75 Ex Parte MOTION for Samuel G. Mann to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2058570) by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Pleading; [Order])(Schwab, Thomas)
January 13, 2020 Filing 74 Ex Parte MOTION for Herbert S. Washer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2058569) by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Pleading; [Order])(Schwab, Thomas)
January 13, 2020 Filing 73 Ex Parte MOTION for Jonathan D. Thier to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2058561) by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Schwab, Thomas)
January 10, 2020 Filing 72 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Of Louisiana. Cantor Fitzgerald & Co. served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020; HSBC Securities USA, Inc. served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020; Hilltop Holdings, Inc. served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020; Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020; Nomura Securities International, Inc. served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019; SG Americas Securities, LLC. served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 POS Hilltop, #2 POS HSBC, #3 POS Morgan Stanley, #4 POS Nomura, #5 POS SG Americas)(Perkins, Alejandro)
January 9, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Damages Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) and 12(B)(6), MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Hilltop Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A)(Dabdoub, Alan)
January 7, 2020 Filing 70 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mizuho Securities, USA LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mizuho Americas LLC, Corporate Parent Mizuho Financial Group, Inc. for Mizuho Securities, USA LLC.. (Brown, James)
January 7, 2020 Filing 69 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jefferies Group LLC, Mizuho Securities, USA LLC, R. W. Baird & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Powers, Lynne)
January 7, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Barclays Bank PLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Stephen Shapiro, #3 Proposed Pleading;)(Golden, Robert)
January 7, 2020 Filing 67 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC.(Schwab, Thomas)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Leave to Withdraw its Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) and Defendant, Barclays Bank PLC's #39 Motion to Dismiss is hereby WITHDRAWN,without prejudice to Defendant Barclays Bank, PLC's right to move to dismiss the Amended Complaint on any of the grounds asserted in its original motion. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/6/2020. (EDC) Modified on 1/8/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
January 6, 2020 Filing 65 ANSWER to #41 First Amended Complaint by Cantor Fitzgerald & Co..(Wisdom, Rachel) Modified on 1/7/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE).
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #63 Motion for John C. Everett, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney John C. Everett, Jr. is enrolled as pro hac vice co-counsel for Defendant Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/6/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
January 3, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #63 MOTION for John C. Everett Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2052660). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
January 3, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION for John C. Everett Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2052660) by R. W. Baird & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John C. Everett Jr., #2 Certificate of Good Standing- D.C., #3 Proposed Order)(Powers, Lynne)
December 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time. Based on the representations in the Motion, Defendants shall file answers or other appropriate pleading on or before the following: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC - January 27, 2020; Nomura Securities International, Inc. - January 21, 2020; HSBC Securities USA, Inc. - January 23, 2020; SG Americas Securities, LLC - January 23, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
December 26, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #61 Ex Parte Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Plead. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
December 26, 2019 Filing 61 Ex Parte Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Plead by HSBC Securities USA, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC.. (Philips, Harry) Modified on 12/26/2019 to edit text (LT).
December 24, 2019 Filing 60 Consent MOTION to Withdraw #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Barclays Bank PLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Golden, Robert)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #58 Motion for Anthony R. Van Vuren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Anthony R. Van Vuren is enrolled as pro hac vice co-counsel for Defendant R. W. Baird & Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/18/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
December 18, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #58 MOTION for Anthony R. Van Vuren to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2047529). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
December 17, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for Anthony R. Van Vuren to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2047529) by R. W. Baird & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anthony R. Van Vuren, #2 Certificate of Good Standing- Maryland, #3 Certificate of Good Standing- D.C., #4 Proposed Order)(Powers, Lynne)
December 17, 2019 Filing 57 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint by UBS Securities LLC.(Freeman, George)
December 17, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6) by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Order)(Ferachi, Michael)
December 17, 2019 Filing 55 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint by Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc.(Ferachi, Michael)
December 17, 2019 Filing 54 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint by J. P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Hite, John)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Consent Motion for Further Extension of Time to Respond. Defendants Barclays Bank PLC, Jefferies Group LLC, Mizuho Securities, USA LLC, and R. W. Baird & Co. are granted an extension of 21 days, or until 1/7/2020, to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/17/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
December 16, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #52 Consent MOTION for Further Extension of Time to Respond as to Barclays Bank PLC, Jefferies Group LLC, Mizuho Securities, USA LLC, R. W. Baird & Co. Incorporated. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
December 16, 2019 Filing 52 Consent MOTION for Further Extension of Time to Respond as to Barclays Bank PLC, Jefferies Group LLC, Mizuho Securities, USA LLC, R. W. Baird & Co. Incorporated by Barclays Bank PLC, Jefferies Group LLC, Mizuho Securities, USA LLC, R. W. Baird & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Powers, Lynne) Modified on 12/16/2019 to edit text (LT).
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #49 and #50 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Jawad B. Muaddi and Jon R. Roellke are enrolled as pro hac vice co-counsel for Defendant Jefferies Group LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/10/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
December 10, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #50 Ex Parte MOTION for Jon R. Roellke to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2043803). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
December 10, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #49 Ex Parte MOTION for Jawad B. Muaddi to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2043796). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
December 10, 2019 Filing 50 Ex Parte MOTION for Jon R. Roellke to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2043803) by Jefferies Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jon R. Roellke, #2 Proposed Order)(Carter, Winstol)
December 10, 2019 Filing 49 Ex Parte MOTION for Jawad B. Muaddi to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2043796) by Jefferies Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jawad B. Muaddi, #2 Proposed Order)(Carter, Winstol)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #22 , #23 , and #32 Motions for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Defendant Bank of America, N.A. answer due 11/29/2019. Defendant Barclays Bank PLC answer due 12/3/2019. Defendant Mizuho Securities, USA LLC answer due 12/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/9/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
December 5, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by State Of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Perkins, Alejandro)
December 5, 2019 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition to #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by State Of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Perkins, Alejandro)
December 5, 2019 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Of Louisiana. Barclays Bank PLC served on 10/4/2019, answer due 11/15/2019; Barclays Capital Inc. served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019; Citigroup Global Markets Inc. served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Credit Suisse AG served on 10/4/2019, answer due 11/15/2019; Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019; J. P. Morgan Securities LLC served on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/12/2019; JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/12/2019; Jefferies Group LLC served on 10/2/2019, answer due 11/13/2019; Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc served on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/12/2019; Mizuho Securities, USA LLC served on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019; R. W. Baird & Co. served on 10/2/2019, answer due 11/13/2019; Stifel Nicolaus & Co., Inc. served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019; UBS Securities LLC served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 POS Barclays Bank, #2 POS Citi Global, #3 POS Credit Suisse AG, #4 POS Credit Suisse Sec, #5 POS Goldman, #6 POS Jeffries, #7 POS JP Morgan Chase, #8 POS JP Morgan Securities, #9 POS Merrill, #10 POS Mizuho, #11 POS Stifel, #12 POS UBS)(Perkins, Alejandro)
December 4, 2019 Filing 44 Summons Issued as to Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
December 4, 2019 Filing 43 Summons Issued as to HSBC Securities USA, Inc., Hilltop Holdings, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
December 4, 2019 Filing 42 Summons Submitted (Attachments: #1 Summons - Hilltop, #2 Summons - HSBC, #3 Summons - Morgan Stanley, #4 Summons - Nomura, #5 Summons - SG Americas)(Perkins, Alejandro)
December 3, 2019 Filing 41 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by State Of Louisiana.(Perkins, Alejandro)
December 3, 2019 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Barclays Bank PLC identifying Corporate Parent Barclays, PLC for Barclays Bank PLC. (Golden, Robert)
December 3, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(B)(2) and 12(B)(6) by Barclays Bank PLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Stephen Shapiro, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Golden, Robert) Modified on 12/3/2019 to edit text. (EDC).
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Kenneth I. Schacter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kenneth I. Schacter is enrolled as pro hac vice co-counsel for defendant Jefferies Group LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/2/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
November 27, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #37 MOTION for Kenneth I. Schacter to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2037909). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
November 27, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Kenneth I. Schacter to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2037909) by Jefferies Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kenneth I. Schacter, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Carter, Winstol)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #30 Ex Parte Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record. Attorney Robert J Dressel is enrolled as co-counsel for defendant UBS Securities LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/27/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
November 26, 2019 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company for Bank of America, N.A.. (Ferachi, Michael)
November 26, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Ferachi, Michael)
November 26, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #32 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
November 26, 2019 Filing 33 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons for Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Hilltop Securities/Hilltop Holdings, Inc., HSBC Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley Co., Nomura Securities International Inc., and SG Americas Securities LLC. The named persons/entities are not reflected on the docket sheet as parties in the case. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (EDC)
November 25, 2019 Filing 32 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Mizuho Securities, USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, James)
November 25, 2019 Filing 31 Summons Submitted (Attachments: #1 Summons - Hilltop, #2 Summons - HSBC, #3 Summons - Morgan Stanley, #4 Summons - Nomura, #5 Summons - SG Americas)(Perkins, Alejandro)
November 20, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #30 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Robert J. Dressel as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
November 20, 2019 Filing 30 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Robert J. Dressel as Additional Attorney by UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Freeman, George)
November 19, 2019 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UBS Securities LLC identifying Corporate Parent UBS Americas Holding LLC, Corporate Parent UBS Americas Inc., Other Affiliate UBS AG, Other Affiliate UBS Group AG for UBS Securities LLC. (Freeman, George)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #20 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Mizuho Securities, USA LLC is granted an extension of 18 days, or until 12/3/2019, to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/18/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
November 18, 2019 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation for Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc. (Ferachi, Michael)
November 15, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Credit Suisse AG identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG for Credit Suisse AG. (Schwab, Thomas)
November 15, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC.(Schwab, Thomas) Modified on 11/18/2019 to edit text (LLH).
November 15, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J. P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Hite, John)
November 15, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, (Further), #22 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
November 15, 2019 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, (Further) by Barclays Bank PLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Patron, David)
November 15, 2019 Filing 22 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Ferachi, Michael)
November 15, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #13 , #14 , #15 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys David J. Arp, Jefferson E. Bell, and Alison Wollin are enrolled as pro hac vice co-counsel for defendant UBS Securities LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/14/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
November 14, 2019 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by Mizuho Securities, USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, James) Modified on 11/18/2019 (SGO).
November 13, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by R. W. Baird & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(POWERS, LYNNE) Modified on 11/14/2019 to edit text (LT).
November 13, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by R. W. Baird & Co. identifying Corporate Parent Baird Financial Group, Inc. for R. W. Baird & Co... (POWERS, LYNNE)
November 13, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jefferies Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Carter, Winstol)
November 13, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jefferies Group LLC identifying Corporate Parent Jefferies Financial Group Inc. for Jefferies Group LLC.. (Carter, Winstol)
November 13, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #15 Ex Parte MOTION for Alison Wollin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2030788), #13 Ex Parte MOTION for David J. Arp to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2030785), #14 Ex Parte MOTION for Jefferson E. Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2030787). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 Ex Parte MOTION for Alison Wollin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2030788) by USB Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate & Declaration, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Freeman, George)
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 Ex Parte MOTION for Jefferson E. Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2030787) by USB Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate & Declaration, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Freeman, George)
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 Ex Parte MOTION for David J. Arp to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2030785) by USB Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D. Arp Certificate & Declaration, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Freeman, George)
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by USB Securities LLC.(Freeman, George)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc.(Ferachi, Michael)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by J. P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Hite, John)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Partial Dismissal/NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal. This matter is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i)of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure all of Plaintiffs claims and this action against Deutsche Bank, Deutsche Bank AG, and FTN only, with each side to bear its own attorneys fees and costs. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/30/2019. (LLH)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Ex Parte Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Plead. The requesting defendants are granted an extension of 21 days as follows: Bank of America, N.A. answer due 11/15/2019; Barclays Bank PLC answer due 11/15/2019; Credit Suisse AG answer due 11/15/2019; Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. answer due 11/12/2019; First Tennessee Bank, N. A. answer due 11/26/2019; J. P. Morgan Securities LLC answer due 11/12/2019; JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 11/12/2019; Jefferies Group LLC answer due 11/13/2019; Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc answer due 11/12/2019; R. W. Baird & Co. answer due 11/13/2019; Mizuho Securities, USA LLC answer due 11/15/2019; USB Securities LLC answer due 11/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/1/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) Modified on 11/4/2019 to correct text (SGO).
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to USMJ: #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by First Tennessee Bank, N. A., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., R. W. Baird & Co., Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc, J. P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jefferies Group LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Credit Suisse AG, USB Securities LLC, Barclays Bank PLC, Bank of America, N.A., Stifel, Mizuho Securities, USA LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/30/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BKA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Partial Dismissal/NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by State Of Louisiana (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Notice of Dismissal)(Perkins, Alejandro) Modified on 10/24/2019 to edit the event(SWE).
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, by Bank of America, N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Credit Suisse AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., First Tennessee Bank, N. A., J. P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jefferies Group LLC, Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc, R. W. Baird & Co., Stifel, Mizuho Securities, USA LLC, USB Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Hite, John)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted (Attachments: #1 Summons - Barclays Bank PLC, #2 Summons - Barclays Capital Inc., #3 Summons - BNP Paribus Securities Corp., #4 Summons - Citigroup Global Markets Inc., #5 Summons - Credit Suisse AG, #6 Summons - Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, #7 Summons - Deutsche Bank AG, #8 Summons - Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., #9 Summons - First Tennessee Bank, N.A., #10 Summons - FTN Financial Securities Corp., #11 Summons - Goldman Sachs & Co, #12 Summons - J. P. Morgan Securities LLC, #13 Summons - JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., #14 Summons - Jefferies Group LLC, #15 Summons - Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc, #16 Summons - Mizuho Securities, USA LLC, #17 Summons - R.W.Baird & Co., #18 Summons - Stifel, #19 Summons - UBS Securities LLC)(Perkins, Alejandro) (Main Document 3 and Attachments 1-19 have been replaced on 9/26/2019) to flatten documents (LT).
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Geri Broussard Baloney regarding Karl Conner who is Co-Counsel for party State of Louisiana. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (LT)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2005205.), filed by STATE OF LOUISIANA, by and through its Attorney General, JEFF LANDRY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perkins, Alejandro) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/24/2019) to flatten doc (LT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Louisiana v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC
Represented By: James Gary Albertine, III
Represented By: John William Hite, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERIES GROUP LLC
Represented By: Winstol D. Carter, Jr.
Represented By: Jawad B Muaddi
Represented By: Kenneth I Schacter
Represented By: Jon R Roellke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.W. BAIRD & CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOLDMAN SACHS & CO. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST TENNESSEE BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: James Gary Albertine, III
Represented By: John William Hite, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNNAMED COCONSPIRATORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CREDIT SUISSE AG
Represented By: Thomas E. Schwab
Represented By: Samuel G Mann
Represented By: Peter J Linken
Represented By: Jonathan D Thier
Represented By: Herbert S. Washer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Represented By: David Patron
Represented By: Robert Harrison Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES INC.
Represented By: Catherine E. Lasky
Represented By: Kerry A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Thomas E. Schwab
Represented By: Peter J Linken
Represented By: Samuel G Mann
Represented By: Jonathan D Thier
Represented By: Herbert S. Washer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FTN FINANCIAL SECURITIES CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Zelma M. Frederick
Represented By: Michael David Ferachi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STIFEL, MIZUHO SECURITIES, USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP PARIBUS SECURITIES CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USB SECURITIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mizuho Securities, USA LLC
Represented By: James A. Brown
Represented By: A'Dair Ragan Flynt
Represented By: Winstol D. Carter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc
Represented By: Zelma M. Frederick
Represented By: Michael David Ferachi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. W. Baird & Co.
Represented By: Lynne Marie Powers
Represented By: Winstol D. Carter, Jr.
Represented By: John Clay Everett, Jr.
Represented By: Anthony R Van Vuren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Represented By: David J Arp
Represented By: Jefferson E Bell
Represented By: Chloe Marie Chetta
Represented By: George C. Freeman, III
Represented By: Alison L. Wollin
Represented By: Robert J Dressel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Tennessee Bank, N. A.
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.
Represented By: Rachel Wendt Wisdom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilltop Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Dabdoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Securities USA, Inc.
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SG Americas Securities, LLC.
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura Securities International, Inc.
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel Nicolaus & Co., Inc.
Represented By: George C. Freeman, III
Represented By: Robert A. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF LOUISIANA, by and through its Attorney General, JEFF LANDRY
Represented By: Alejandro R. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Of Louisiana
Represented By: Alejandro R. Perkins
Represented By: Geraldine Broussard Baloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?