Bailey v. CEC Entertainment
Defendant: CEC Entertainment, Inc. and Sefera Bailey
Case Number: 3:2019cv00644
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Vacating #15 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/20/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2020 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/19/2019. (EDC)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 Hearing Report and Order/Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes: Show Cause Hearing held on 11/18/2019. Plaintiff's failure to comply with the Court's prior Orders was discussed. The Court finds that subject matter jurisdiction is present and will issue a Scheduling Order in due course. (KAH)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff Sefera Bailey shall appear through counsel at a hearing scheduled for November 18, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes and show cause for her failure to comply with the Courts September 27, 2019 #5 Notice and Order regarding subject matter jurisdiction. In lieu of appearing for the hearing, Plaintiff shall comply with the Courts #5 Order by no later than November 14, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/5/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support of Federal Jurisdiction by CEC Entertainment, Inc. (SWE)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #10 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Federal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant CEC Entertainment, Inc. is GRANTED. The clerk is directed to file the Supplemental Memorandum and attachments thereto at R. Doc. 10-1 into the record of this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/10/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 10, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Federal Jurisdiction. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Federal Jurisdiction by CEC Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Supp Memo in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Aubert, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/9/2019 to correct page orientation) (KMW).
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Continue Deadline to Submit Proof of Jurisdictional Amount. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/8/2019. (EDC)
October 8, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Deadline to Submit Proof of Jurisdictional Amount . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support of Federal Jurisdiction regarding #5 Notice and Order (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex A-Affirmation of Counsel)(Aubert, Christopher) Modified on 10/8/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Deadline to Submit Proof of Jurisdictional Amount by CEC Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Aubert, Christopher)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 11/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/01/2019. (ELW)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER: On or before 10/7/2019, Defendant CEC Entertainment, Inc. shall file a memorandum and supporting evidence concerning whether the amount in controversy requirement of 28 U.S.C. 1332 is met. On or before 10/14/2019, Plaintiff Sefera Bailey shall file either: (1) a Notice stating that Plaintiff does not dispute that Defendant has established the jurisdictional requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1332, or (2) a Motion to Remand. The case will be allowed to proceed if jurisdiction is adequately established. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/26/2019. (KAH)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by CEC Entertainment, Inc..(Aubert, Christopher)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CEC Entertainment, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Queso Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent AP VIII CEC Holdings, L.P., Corporate Parent CEC Entertainment, Inc. for CEC Entertainment, Inc... (Aubert, Christopher)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of List of All Parties & Pleadings by CEC Entertainment, Inc. (Aubert, Christopher)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number C-687139. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2006683), filed by CEC Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex A - Petition, #3 Exhibit Ex B - Notice of Service, #4 Exhibit Ex C - Sec of State Info, #5 Exhibit Ex D - Stipulation, #6 Exhibit Ex E - Not of Filing)(Aubert, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. CEC Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEC Entertainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sefera Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?