Alkadi v. American Cancer Society, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rodiena Alkadi
Defendant: American Cancer Society, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00662
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Stephen C. Carleton and Carmen T. Hebert for Rodiena Alkadi replacing G. Karl Bernard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
November 25, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Carmen T. Hebert in place of G. Karl Bernard as Attorney of Record. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Carmen T. Hebert in place of G. Karl Bernard as Attorney of Record by Rodiena Alkadi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Bernard, G.)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Cancer Society, Inc. (Miller, Eric)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by American Cancer Society, Inc..(Miller, Eric)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/4/2019. (BLR)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, EBR Parish, Case Number C-686961. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2009107), filed by American Cancer Society, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Miller, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alkadi v. American Cancer Society, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodiena Alkadi
Represented By: G. Karl Bernard
Represented By: Carmen T. Hebert
Represented By: Stephen C. Carleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Cancer Society, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Ray Miller
Represented By: Alexandra V Navarre-Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?