Landrum v. Landry
Petitioner: Charles William Landrum
Respondent: Jeff Landry
Case Number: 3:2019cv00668
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 Return on FedEx Confirmation as to #4 Habeas Corpus Order(SWE)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: In order for this Court to determine the action, if any, that shall be taken on this application,the District Attorney for the Parish of EBR shall file an answer & memo of authorities, along w/copies of all briefs & memoranda. Along with the response, The District Attorney for the 19th Judicial District Court shall file an electronic certified copy of the state court record, including transcripts of all proceedings held in the state courts as well as a certified electronic copy of all documents. The Clerk of Court for the 19th Judicial District Court shall file, in a conventional manner, not electronic, a courtesy copy of the entire state court record filed by the state. The Clerk of this Court serve, by any means which provides tracking and delivery confirmation, a copy of the entire application & this order on the Attorney General for the State of Louisiana, the District Attorney for the Parish of EBR, and the Clerk of Court for 19th Judicial District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Fed Ex Confirmation)(SWE)
October 21, 2019 Confirmation of receipt of payment from Charles Landrum in the amount of $5.00. Transaction posted on 10/18/2019. Receipt number 4699029772 processed by kwilcox. (TDA)
October 18, 2019 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Amended PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Charles William Landrum. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(KMW)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Letter of Deficiency: The Clerk has filed your new suit. However, it is deficient in the areas as stated herein. The deficiency must be corrected within the given time frame. Amended Pleadings due by 10/25/2019. Filing Fee due by 10/25/2019. Statement of Account due by 10/25/2019. (KAH)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Charles William Landrum. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landrum v. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles William Landrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?