Griffin v. Vannoy et al
Petitioner: Morris Griffin
Respondent: Jeff Landry and Darrel Vannoy
Case Number: 3:2019cv00684
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce a Hard Copy of the State Court Record and for Respondent to Produce an Electronic Copy of the State Court Record and to file a Response to Petition by All Defendants. (Lacy, Terri) Modified on 12/2/2019 to edit text. (EDC).
December 2, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time State Court Record and Response to Petition. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 Return on FedEx Confirmation as to #4 Habeas Corpus Order. (KAH)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: In order for this Court to determine the action, if any, that shall be taken on this application,the District Attorney for the Parish of Pointe Coupee shall file an answer & memo of authorities, along w/copies of all briefs & memoranda. Along with the response, The District Attorney for the 18th Judicial District Court shall file an electronic certified copy of the state court record, including transcripts of all proceedings held in the state courts as well as a certified electronic copy of all documents. The Clerk of Court for the 18th Judicial District Court shall file, in a conventional manner, not electronic, a courtesy copy of the entire state court record filed by the state. The Clerk of this Court serve, by any means which provides tracking and delivery confirmation, a copy of the entire application & this order on the Attorney General for the State of Louisiana, the District Attorney for the Parish of Pointe Coupee, and the Clerk of Court for 18th Judicial District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(KAH)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. A copy of this order shall be sent to the plaintiff and to Centralized Inmate Banking. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/31/2019. (SWE)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Morris Griffin. (KMW)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Morris Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Attachment Declaration of Inamte Filing, #4 Attachment Cover Letter)(KMW)
October 7, 2019 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)
October 7, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Vannoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Landry
Represented By: Terri Russo Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darrel Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Morris Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?