Kuykendall v. State Of Louisiana et al
Petitioner: Joseph Kuykendall
Respondent: Jeff Landry and State Of Louisiana
Case Number: 3:2019cv00685
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 Courtesy Copy of State Court Record Received in Clerk's Office. This record includes 1 volume(s) from the 19th JDC and contains no original(s). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EDC)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 State Court Record (Habeas Case). (Wright, Stacy)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Additional Portions of State Court Record in Elecronic Form by Jeff Landry (Attachments: #1 Attachment Additional Portions of State Court Record)(Wright, Stacy)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jeff Landry. (Wright, Stacy) Modified on 11/26/2019 to edit text (LT).
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Answer to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Jeff Landry.(Wright, Stacy) Modified on 11/26/2019 to edit text (LT).
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 Return on FedEx Confirmation as to #2 Habeas Corpus Order.(EDC)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: In order for this Court to determine the action, if any, that shall be taken on this application,the District Attorney for the Parish of East Baton Rouge shall file an answer & memo of authorities, along w/copies of all briefs & memoranda. Along with the response, The District Attorney for the 19th JDC Judicial District Court shall file an electronic certified copy of the state court record, including transcripts of all proceedings held in the state courts as well as a certified electronic copy of all documents. The Clerk of Court for the 19th JDC Judicial District Court shall file, in a conventional manner, not electronic, a courtesy copy of the entire state court record filed by the state. The Clerk of this Court serve, by any means which provides tracking and delivery confirmation, a copy of the entire application & this order on the Attorney General for the State of Louisiana, the District Attorney for the Parish of East Baton Rouge, and the Clerk of Court for 19th JDC Judicial District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(EDC)
October 9, 2019 Confirmation of receipt of payment from Joseph Kuykendall in the amount of $5.00. Transaction posted on 10/8/2019. Receipt number 4699029745 processed by kwilcox. (TDA)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.00), filed by Joseph Kuykendall. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment)(KMW)
October 7, 2019 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuykendall v. State Of Louisiana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Landry
Represented By: Stacy Lynn Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State Of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Kuykendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?