Benoit et al v. Gomez et al
Plaintiff: Anastassiya Benoit and Brian Benoit
Defendant: Stanley Crockett, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, William Barr and Cindy Gomez
Case Number: 3:2019cv00692
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 1/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/20/2019. (SGO)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Stanley Crockett, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, and Brandon Fremin (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Submitted (Attachments: #1 Summons - Fremin, #2 Summons - Cindy Gomez, #3 Summons - Crocket, #4 Summons - Cuccinelli, #5 Summons - McAleenan)(Scott, Paul)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Mandamus against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2013515.), filed by Anastassiya Benoit, Brian Benoit. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scott, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benoit et al v. Gomez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anastassiya Benoit
Represented By: Paul H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Benoit
Represented By: Paul H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Crockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?