Houghton v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Charles Houghton
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. and Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00695
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT by Charles Houghton. (Bateman, David)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd..(Jani, Alexis)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying without prejudice the #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for failure to show good cause or that the requirements of Local Civil Rule 7(a) are met. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 25, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Petition for Damages. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Petition for Damages by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Jani, Alexis)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/11/2019. (ELW)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 First MOTION to Substitute #1 Notice of Removal. The clerk's office is directed to replace R. Doc. 1 with R. Doc. 2-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 11, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 First MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (KMW)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Notice of Removal, #2 Proposed Order)(Jani, Alexis)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court for the Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number C-687333. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2014357), filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 List of Party Pleadings, #3 Corporate Disclosure, #4 Exhibit 1 - Petition for Damages, #5 Exhibit 2 - Request for Notice, #6 Exhibit 3 - Motion for Extension, #7 Exhibit 4 - Request for Notice, #8 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit 6 - Conn. Sentinel, #10 Exhibit 7 - Conn. Hartford, #11 Exhibit 8 - Ill. Allstate, #12 Exhibit 9 - Consent)(Jani, Alexis) (Attachment 11 replaced on 10/11/2019 to correct page orientation) (KMW). (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/11/2019) (ELW). Modified on 10/11/2019 as granted by rec doc #4 (ELW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houghton v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Alexis R Jani
Represented By: Terrill W. Boykin
Represented By: Kriste Louise Talton Utley
Represented By: Ross Adam Ledet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company
Represented By: Alexis R Jani
Represented By: Terrill W. Boykin
Represented By: Kriste Louise Talton Utley
Represented By: Ross Adam Ledet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Houghton
Represented By: John Michael McDonald
Represented By: David Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?