Murphy v. Central Plumbing Company LLC
Plaintiff: Patrick M Murphy
Defendant: Central Plumbing Company LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00720
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT by All Defendants. (Bowling, Tori)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Central Plumbing Company LLC.(Bowling, Tori)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick M Murphy. Central Plumbing Company LLC served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Wilson, Scott)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/18/2019. (SWE)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Central Plumbing Company LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Central Plumbing Company LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2017508.), filed by Patrick M Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit 2-Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Attachment Summons)(Wilson, Scott) (Attachment 3 and 4 replaced on 10/17/2019to flatten document) (LT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Central Plumbing Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Plumbing Company LLC
Represented By: Tori S. Bowling
Represented By: Crews Reynolds LeBlanc, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick M Murphy
Represented By: Scott D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?