Gehant v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jerome J Gehant
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation, IDEX Corporation, Utica Mutual Insurance Company, McDermott, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, The Nash Engineering Company, General Electric Company, Technip USA, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, TIG Insurance Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, Chet Morrison Offshore, L.L.C., Crane Co., CBS Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc. and Offshore Specialty Fabricators, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00732
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 38 RULING granting #6 Motion to Dismiss, and CBS is dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/18/2019. (EDC)
December 18, 2019 Filing 37 RULING granting #3 Motion to Dismiss, and GE is dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/18/2019. (EDC)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/5/2019. (SWE)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/21/2019. (SWE)
November 21, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss Offshore Specialty Fabricators, LLC by Jerome J Gehant. (Anderman, Jody)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/20/2019. (SWE)
November 20, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss Utica Mutual Insurance Company by Jerome J Gehant. (Anderman, Jody)
November 14, 2019 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.. (Strain, Stacey)
November 13, 2019 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Utica Mutual Insurance Company. (Kohn, Susan)
November 12, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses of General Electric Company to the Petition for Damages to Complaint by General Electric Company.(Bowlin, Angela) Modified on 11/13/2019 to edit text (LT).
November 12, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Foster Wheeler Corporation.(Bowlin, Angela) Modified on 11/13/2019 to edit text (LT).
November 8, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint by IMO Industries, Inc..(Oser, Daniel)
November 8, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Oser, Daniel)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Partial Dismissal without Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/8/2019. (SWE)
November 8, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Warren Pumps, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for Warren Pumps, LLC. (Oser, Daniel)
November 8, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMO Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for IMO Industries, Inc.. (Oser, Daniel)
November 7, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Eagan, Kelsey)
November 7, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Eagan, Kelsey)
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 Partial Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice by TIG Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Lonero, Jay) Modified on 11/8/2019 to edit text (LT).
November 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Supplemental Section 1447 Notice of Compliance by Foster Wheeler Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 EBR Parish State Court Record, #2 Part 1, #3 Part 2, #4 Part 3, #5 Part 4, #6 Part 5)(Hainkel, John) (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/8/2019 to correct page orientation) (KMW).
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE AND ORDER denying as moot #7 , #8 , #10 , #13 and #15 Motion for Joinder with Notice of Removal filed by Defendants General Electric Company, CBS Corporation; Crane Co.; IDEX Corporation; and Technip USA, Inc. The Motions for Joinder are construed as notices of consent to removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/1/2019. (SWE) Modified on 11/1/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Joinder with #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by General Electric Company, #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CBS Corporation by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Romero, Jacqueline)
October 30, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #15 MOTION for Joinder with #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation, #13 MOTION for Joinder with #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
October 29, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Technip USA, Inc..(Matherne, James)
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Joinder with #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation by Technip USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Matherne, James)
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 Consent to Removal by Jerome J Gehant (Anderman, Jody)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Joinder with #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation by IDEX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Matherne, James)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE AND ORDER: By no later than October 30, 2019, Plaintiff Jerome Gehant shall file a notice with the Court, advising whether Plaintiff opposes the pending #7 , #8 , #10 Motions for Joinder with Notice of Removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
October 24, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Joinder with #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (LT)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Joinder with #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Romero, Jacqueline)
October 24, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Joinder with #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
October 24, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Joinder with #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 Letter to Attorney Cameron R. Waddell regarding James R. Murrell who is Co-Counsel for party Jerome J. Gehant. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (LT)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Joinder with #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Eagan, Kelsey)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Joinder with #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Eagan, Kelsey)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Eagan, Kelsey)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc., Corporate Parent GAMCO Investors, Inc. for CBS Corporation.. (Eagan, Kelsey)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Eagan, Kelsey)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Eagan, Kelsey)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler Corporation identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group PLC for Foster Wheeler Corporation.. (Hainkel, John)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 688127. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2020723), filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Notice of Compliance)(Hainkel, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gehant v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey Anne Eagan
Represented By: Kelly Lorraine Long
Represented By: Lacey T McCoy
Represented By: John J. Hainkel, III
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDEX Corporation
Represented By: Colin Felicien Lozes
Represented By: James M. Matherne
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utica Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDermott, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Stacey Leigh Strain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nash Engineering Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Kelsey Anne Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly Lorraine Long
Represented By: Lacey T McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: John J. Hainkel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technip USA, Inc.
Represented By: Colin Felicien Lozes
Represented By: James M. Matherne
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey Anne Eagan
Represented By: Kelly Lorraine Long
Represented By: Lacey T McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: John J. Hainkel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIG Insurance Company
Represented By: Jay M. Lonero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Represented By: Daniel Edwin Oser
Represented By: Joseph Henry Hart, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chet Morrison Offshore, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Jacqueline Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Kelsey Anne Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly Lorraine Long
Represented By: Lacey T McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: John J. Hainkel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Represented By: Daniel Edwin Oser
Represented By: Joseph Henry Hart, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offshore Specialty Fabricators, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome J Gehant
Represented By: Jody E. Anderman
Represented By: Meredith Kay Clark
Represented By: Claire Carville Ross
Represented By: Cameron Ray Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?