Fleming v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Don Fleming
Defendant: BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Not Yet Classified: Nathan L. Nelson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00740
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 Letter to Attorney Nathan L. Nelson who is lead counsel for party Don Fleming. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (EDC)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 Letter to Attorney Don K. Haycraft regarding Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney and Georgia L. Lucier who are Co-Counsel for party BP Exploration & Production Inc. and BP America Production Company. Attorneys are not admitted to practice in LAMD. (EDC)
October 29, 2019 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Judge John W. deGravelles no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EDC)
October 29, 2019 Case assigned to Judge John W. deGravelles and Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EDC)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from the Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-11311. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 10/28/2019. (NEF: Section J) (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/29/2019.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/29/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/29/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER'S NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/29/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/29/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7719052) filed by Don Fleming. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Election Not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Nathan Lee Nelson added to party Don Fleming(pty:pla).(Nelson, Nathan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleming v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Nathan L. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler
Represented By: Don K. Haycraft
Represented By: Devin C. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler
Represented By: Don K. Haycraft
Represented By: Devin C. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?