Russell v. Parkview Baptist School, Inc.
Plaintiff: Beverly H Russell
Defendant: Parkview Baptist School, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00760
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Parkview Baptist School, Inc..(Foster, Murphy)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/6/2019. (EDC)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Parkview Baptist School, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Parkview Baptist School, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2027475.), filed by Beverly H Russell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Attachment Summons)(Wilson, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. Parkview Baptist School, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly H Russell
Represented By: Scott D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkview Baptist School, Inc.
Represented By: Murphy James Foster, III
Represented By: Alexandra Cobb Hains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?