Scott v. Capital Area Family Violence Intervention Center, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Koreen M Scott and Koreen Scott
Defendant: IRIS Domestic Violence Center and Capital Area Family Violence Intervention Center, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00762
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT by Koreen Scott. (Sudduth, James)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Capital Area Family Violence Intervention Center, Inc..(Blanchfield, Andrew)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 1/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/20/2019. (SGO)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Attorney James Edward Sudduth, III regarding Kourtney L. Kech and Pierce A. Rapin who are Co-Counsel for party Koreen Scott. Attorneys are not admitted to practice in LAMD. (EDC)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 Exhibit(s) to #1 Complaint by Koreen M Scott. (Sudduth, James)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against IRIS Domestic Violence Center ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2027684.), filed by Koreen M Scott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Signed Verification, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Sudduth, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Capital Area Family Violence Intervention Center, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koreen M Scott
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koreen Scott
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRIS Domestic Violence Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Area Family Violence Intervention Center, Inc.
Represented By: Tori S. Bowling
Represented By: Andrew Blanchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?