Gore v. Cyclone Technology, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Doug Gore
Defendant: Cyclone Technology, LLC, Blastrac N.A., Inc. and Cummins, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00773
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 15 Notice to Counsel: At the request of the parties received via facsimile, the Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2020 is RESET for 3/12/2020 at 9:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. A Status Report shall be filed on or before 2/27/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
December 27, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Blastrac N.A., Inc., Cummins, Inc., Cyclone Technology, LLC, filed by Doug Gore.(Dalton, Richard)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time and Memorandum of Law in Support. Defendant Cummins, Inc. is granted an extension until 1/17/2020 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/18/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
December 17, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 Defendant's Cummins Inc.'s Unopposed MOTION for Extension and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
December 17, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's Cummins Inc.'s Unopposed MOTION for Extension and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion by Cummins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benach, Carlos) Modified on 12/17/2019 to edit text (LT).
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Plead. Defendant Cummins, Inc. is granted an extension of 21 days, or until 1/2/2020, to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/3/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
December 2, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Doug Gore. Blastrac N.A., Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Dalton, Richard)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint by Cummins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benach, Carlos)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Doug Gore. Cummins, Inc. served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Dalton, Richard)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, that, on or before 12/6/2019, the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint providing the citizenship of defendants Cyclone Technology, LLC and Cummins, Inc., by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/22/2019. (KAH)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 3:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 1/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/21/2019. (SGO)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Doug Gore. Cyclone Technology, LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Dalton, Richard)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Blastrac N.A., Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted (Dalton, Richard)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cummins, Inc., Cyclone Technology, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2029768.), filed by Doug Gore. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment)(Dalton, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gore v. Cyclone Technology, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyclone Technology, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blastrac N.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy F. Daniels
Represented By: Carlos A Benach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Gore
Represented By: Richard C. Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?