Santiny Contractors, LLC v. Sayania et al
Plaintiff: Santiny Contractors, LLC
Defendant: Vicram Sayania and Nobel Hotels, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00780
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #5 Motion to Substitute Complaint filed by Plaintiff Santiny Contractors, LLC is HEREBY GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to substitute the Amended Complaint at R. Doc. 5-1 in the place of the original Complaint at R. Doc. 1, which shall become the operative Complaint in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/3/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 3, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Substitute Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Substitute Complaint by Santiny Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Barber, Jacqueline)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER: On or before 12/2/2019, Plaintiff Santiny Contractors, LLC shall file a motion to substitute its Complaint with a proposed pleading that is a comprehensive amended Complaint as set forth herein. The case will be allowed to proceed if jurisdiction is adequately established. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/22/2019. (SWE) Modified on 11/22/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE). Modified on 11/26/2019 to edit text(SWE).
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet by Santiny Contractors, LLC (Barber, Jacqueline)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/14/2019. (BLR)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2031184.), filed by Santiny Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Barber, Jacqueline) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/14/2019 to correct page orientation) (SWE). (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/3/2019 in accordance with RD 6) (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santiny Contractors, LLC v. Sayania et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicram Sayania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nobel Hotels, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santiny Contractors, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?