Luevano v. Colonial Pipeline Company
Plaintiff: Jesus Luevano
Defendant: Colonial Pipeline Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00783
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Deadline to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Colonial Pipeline shall have seven days following the expiration of the ninety-day stay, if granted, to file its responsive pleading to the Plaintiffs Complaint. Alternatively, if the ninety-day stay is denied, Colonial shall have seven (7) days following the Courts denial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/10/2020. (SWE)
January 10, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 Unopposed MOTION Reset Status Report Deadline . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
January 9, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION Reset Status Report Deadline by Jesus Luevano. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Woods, Kelly)
January 7, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Colonial Pipeline Company. (Letten, James) Modified on 1/7/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Stay by Jesus Luevano. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Woods, Kelly)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Colonial Pipeline Company answer due 1/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/20/2019. (NLT)
December 19, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Response to Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Response to Complaint by Colonial Pipeline Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Letten, James)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jesus Luevano. Colonial Pipeline Company served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Woods, Kelly)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Muhammad S. Aziz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/3/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
November 26, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Muhammad S. Aziz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2037106). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Muhammad S. Aziz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2037106) by Jesus Luevano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Woods, Kelly)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/15/2019. (BLR)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Colonial Pipeline Company. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Collateral Proceeding by Jesus Luevano (Woods, Kelly)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Colonial Pipeline Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2031894.), filed by Jesus Luevano. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons)(Woods, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luevano v. Colonial Pipeline Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial Pipeline Company
Represented By: James B. Letten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Luevano
Represented By: Kelly Marie Woods
Represented By: Muhammad S. Aziz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?