Squeeze Me Once, LLC v. SunTrust Bank et al
Plaintiff: Squeeze Me Once, LLC
Defendant: John Does 1-10 and SunTrust Bank
Case Number: 3:2019cv00787
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. is CONVERTED to a Telephone Conference. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at 225-389-3602. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(SGO)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Squeeze Me Once, LLC. (Stewart, Jesse)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Squeeze Me Once, LLC. (Stewart, Jesse)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #5 MOTION to Dismiss : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 25 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 10 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(JHF)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by SunTrust Bank. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Kimbrough, Camalla)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 1/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/21/2019. (SGO)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant SunTrust Bank is granted an extension of 21 days, or until 12/12/2019, to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/21/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
November 20, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SunTrust Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Kimbrough, Camalla)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number 689215. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2032235), filed by SunTrust Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Kimbrough, Camalla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Squeeze Me Once, LLC v. SunTrust Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Bank
Represented By: Camalla M Kimbrough
Represented By: Katie L. Dysart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Squeeze Me Once, LLC
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Jesse Cobb Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?