McLendon v. Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Rodney Mclendon
Defendant: Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company and Jason Reisenberg
Case Number: 3:2019cv00803
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service by Rodney McLendon re #9 Certificate of Service on Tennessee Farmers (Attachments: #1 Return Receipt)(Jacobs, John) Modified on 1/15/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
January 15, 2020 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service by Rodney McLendon on Jason Riesenberg (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Jacobs, John) Modified on 1/15/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Rodney McLendon (Jacobs, John) Modified on 1/15/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE).
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel: In light of all defendant having not made and appearance, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 4/2/2020 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 3/19/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation, Corporate Parent Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc. for Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company. (Foote, Jason)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Compliance by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company to #1 Complaint, Certificate of Filing of State Court Recor, and List of Attorneys (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Exhibit, #3 Attachment)(Foote, Jason)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of the Amount in Controversy filed by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Foote, Jason)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE and ORDER: as to #1 Complaint, filed by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company shall file a memorandum and supporting evidence concerning whether the amount in controversy requirement of 28 U.S.C. 1332 is met by 12/9/2019. Plaintiff shall file either: (1) a Notice stating that Plaintiff does not dispute that Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company has established the jurisdictional requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1332; or (2) a Motion to Remand filed by 12/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/02/2019. (ELW)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company.(Foote, Jason)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/25/2019. (EDC)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2034510.), filed by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Foote, Jason) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/20/2019 to flatten document) and edit text (LT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLendon v. Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company
Represented By: James Devin Caboni-Quinn
Represented By: Jason P. Foote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Reisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Mclendon
Represented By: Kevin P. Kleinpeter
Represented By: C. John Naquin, Jr.
Represented By: John C. Jacobs
Represented By: John T. Joubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?