Livingston Parish v. TEVA Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Livingston Parish
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, INSYS Therapeutics, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Allergan PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Morris and Dickson Co., LLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Teva Pharmaceutical, USA, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Noramco, Inc. and Janssen Pharmaceuticals
Case Number: 3:2019cv00807
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 14 Return on Electronic Transfer from Northern District of Ohio. (KAH)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (EDC)
December 12, 2019 Filing 12 Extraction Log of a case Transferred to Northern District of Ohio. (EDC)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(EDC)
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (EDC)
December 12, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Answer. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Answer by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Williams, Stacey)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Joining Manufacturing Defendants to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition. Manufacturing Defendants are allowed an extension up to and including 60 days after a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order or this Court's Ruling on the Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/5/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
December 2, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Jaeckel, Shannon)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 Supplemental #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Jaeckel, Shannon) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/2/2019) (EDC). Modified on 12/2/2019 to rotate pages. (EDC).
November 26, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Livingston Parish. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Honeycutt, Hannah)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (LT) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/25/2019 to edit case information) (LT).
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Collateral Proceedings by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2035178), filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit to Notice of Removal)(Williams, Stacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Livingston Parish v. TEVA Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: David O'Quinn
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: David O'Quinn
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: William Michael Adams
Represented By: Stacey Denise Williams
Represented By: Scott R. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc
Represented By: Franklin J Foil
Represented By: Stacey Denise Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Represented By: Harry A. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSYS Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris and Dickson Co., LLC
Represented By: Franklin Harris Spruiell, Jr.
Represented By: Russell Reginald Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical, USA, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: David O'Quinn
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Represented By: Thomas MacDougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Represented By: Shelley Kathryn Napolitano
Represented By: Stacey Denise Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: David O'Quinn
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: David O'Quinn
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Livingston Parish
Represented By: Frank C. Dudenhefer, Jr.
Represented By: Hannah Elayne Honeycutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?