ABC Professional Tree Services, Inc. v. Dixie Electric Membership Corporation, Inc.
Plaintiff: ABC Professional Tree Services, Inc.
Defendant: Dixie Electric Membership Corporation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00810
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Counterclaim by ABC Professional Tree Services, Inc..(Badeaux, Richard) Modified on 1/6/2020 to edit text and edit event type (LT).
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIM against ABC Professional Tree Services, Inc. by Dixie Electric Membership Corporation, Inc..(Gildersleeve, Thomas) Modified on 12/16/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW).
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record for failure to comply with Local Rule 83(b)(3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 11, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 First MOTION to Enroll as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION to Enroll as Additional Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Badeaux, Richard)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ABC Professional Tree Services, Inc.. Dixie Electric Membership Corporation, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Badeaux, Richard)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/25/2019. (KAH)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Dixie Electric Membership Corporation, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT, SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE, AND DAMAGES against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2035809.), filed by ABC Professional Tree Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment)(Badeaux, Richard) Modified on 11/25/2019 to edit text. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABC Professional Tree Services, Inc. v. Dixie Electric Membership Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie Electric Membership Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: James Leeper Ellis
Represented By: Thomas D. Gildersleeve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABC Professional Tree Services, Inc.
Represented By: Richard C. Badeaux
Represented By: Sidney W. Degan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?