Northern Frac Proppants, LLC et al v. Regions Bank, NA et al
Plaintiff: Northern Frac Proppants, LLC, Series 1, Northern Frac Proppants, LLC, Series 2 and Northern Frac Proppants, LLC
Defendant: Chadler Cornett, Regions Bank and Regions Bank, NA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00811
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Chadler Cornett.(Bourgeois, Thomas)
January 8, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to #1 Complaint, by Regions Bank, NA.(Ferachi, Michael) Modified on 1/8/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE).
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to #1 Complaint for sufficient showing of excusable neglect under FRCP 6(b)(1)(B). Chadler Cornett is hereby granted an extension of time to 1/14/2020 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/7/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
January 7, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Chadler Cornett. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Bourgeois, Thomas)
December 30, 2019 Filing 12 Memorandum regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Regions Bank, NA. (Ferachi, Michael) Modified on 12/31/2019 to edit text (LT).
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for George J. Spathis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/20/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 18, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 Ex Parte MOTION for George J. Spathis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2047814). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION for George J. Spathis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2047814) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Keegan, Kyle)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Diversity Jurisdiction regarding #4 Notice and Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Robichaux, Amber) Modified on 12/17/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to complaint under pursuant to Local Rule 7(a). Regions Bank, NA isgranted an extension of time through and including January 8, 2020, within which to fileresponsive pleadings to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/16/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 13, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, by Regions Bank, NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Ferachi, Michael)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Northern Frac Proppants, LLC, Northern Frac Proppants, LLC, Series 2, Northern Frac Proppants, LLC, Series 1. Chadler Cornett served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Robichaux, Amber)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Northern Frac Proppants, LLC, Northern Frac Proppants, LLC, Series 2, Northern Frac Proppants, LLC, Series 1. Regions Bank, NA served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (Robichaux, Amber)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER: On or before 12/17/2019, Plaintiffs shall file a memorandum and supporting evidence regarding Plaintiffs contention that Mr. Alston has been judicially deemed to have abandoned his membership interests such that Mr. Alston's citizenship can be disregarded. Alternatively, on or before 12/17/2019, Plaintiffs shall file a notice of voluntary dismissal of their Complaint, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(i). On or before 12/31/2019, Defendants shall file either a Notice stating that Defendants agree that the citizenship of Mr. Alston can be disregarded for purposes of federal subject matter jurisdiction or a Motion to Dismiss based on lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/3/2019. (EDC)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/25/2019. (KAH)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Chadler Cornett, Regions Bank, NA. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KAH)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chadler Cornett, Regions Bank ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2035989.), filed by Northern Frac Proppants, LLC, Northern Frac Proppants, LLC, Series 2, Northern Frac Proppants, LLC, Series 1. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Collateral Proceedings, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Robichaux, Amber)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northern Frac Proppants, LLC et al v. Regions Bank, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Frac Proppants, LLC, Series 1
Represented By: Amber Nicole Robichaux
Represented By: George J. Spathis
Represented By: J. Brian Juban
Represented By: Kyle M. Keegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Frac Proppants, LLC, Series 2
Represented By: Amber Nicole Robichaux
Represented By: George J. Spathis
Represented By: J. Brian Juban
Represented By: Kyle M. Keegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Frac Proppants, LLC
Represented By: Amber Nicole Robichaux
Represented By: George J. Spathis
Represented By: J. Brian Juban
Represented By: Kyle M. Keegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chadler Cornett
Represented By: Michael Jason deBarros
Represented By: James Rodney Chastain, Jr
Represented By: Thomas Dalton Bourgeois, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Bank, NA
Represented By: Juston M. O'Brien
Represented By: Michael David Ferachi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?