Wagner v. Plexos Group, LLC
Plaintiff: James Patrick Wagner, Gregory Tauzier, Joseph Belcourt, Timothy Parker and Christine Sistad
Defendant: Plexos Group, LLC and Plexos Group, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00822
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Richard J. (Rex) Burch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2063679) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Bohrer, Philip)
January 23, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 MOTION for Richard J. (Rex) Burch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2063679). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
January 16, 2020 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Bohrer, Philip)
January 8, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Plexos Group, L.L.C..(Roussel, Elizabeth)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time pursuant to Local Rule 7(a). Plexos Group, L.L.C. answer due 1/8/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/18/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 18, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by All Defendants. (Roussel, Elizabeth)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Michael A. Josephson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/16/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for MIchael A. Josephson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2045400) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Bohrer, Philip)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/30/2020 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/11/2019. (KAH)
December 12, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION for MIchael A. Josephson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2045400). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory Tauzier, Christine Sistad, James Patrick Wagner, Timothy Parker, Joseph Belcourt. Plexos Group, L.L.C. served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (Bohrer, Philip)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Plexos Group, L.L.C.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Submitted (Bohrer, Philip)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons for David Futon Odom. The summons were not completely filled out. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (SWE)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue by James Patrick Wagner (Bohrer, Philip)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2037484.), filed by James Patrick Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Bohrer, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner v. Plexos Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plexos Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plexos Group, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jennifer Hope Del Rio
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Roussel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Patrick Wagner
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Michael Josephson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Tauzier
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Michael Josephson
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Belcourt
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Michael Josephson
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Parker
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Michael Josephson
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Sistad
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Michael Josephson
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?