iMortgage Services LLC v. Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board et al
Plaintiff: iMortgage Services LLC and iMortgage Services, LLC
Defendant: Gayle A Boudoquie, Roland M Hall, Clayton F Lipscomb, Newton J Landry, Michael A Graham, Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board, Tommie E McMorris, Sr., Cheryl B Bella, Timothy W Hammett, Newton J. Landry, Tommie E. McMorris, Sr., Timothy W. Hammett, Roland M. Hall, Michael A. Graham, Clayton F. Lipscomb, Gayle A. Boudousquie and Cheryl B. Bella
Case Number: 3:2019cv00849
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #17 and #18 Motions for Seth David Greenstein and William Stephen Cannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/27/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Strike Appearance of Counsel (R. Doc. 19). Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/27/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
January 23, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #20 First MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 19 . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
January 23, 2020 Filing 20 First MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 19 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Edwards, Arlene) Modified on 1/23/2020 to edit text (LT).
January 22, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #18 Second MOTION for William Stephen Cannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number BLAMDC-2063151). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
January 22, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #17 Second MOTION for Seth David Greenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2063130). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
January 22, 2020 Filing 19 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD Appearance of Counsel by All Defendants. (Edwards, Arlene) Modified on 1/22/2020 to edit text (LT). Modified on 1/28/2020 to remove the document as it has been stricken in accordance with record document 21 (KAH).
January 22, 2020 Filing 18 Second MOTION for William Stephen Cannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number BLAMDC-2063151) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order, #2 Attachment Declaration, #3 Attachment Cert. of Good Standing, #4 Attachment Appearance)(Edwards, Arlene)
January 22, 2020 Filing 17 Second MOTION for Seth David Greenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2063130) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration, #2 Attachment Proposed Order, #3 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Attachment Appearance)(Edwards, Arlene)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/2/2020 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 3/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/8/2020. (BLR)
December 18, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 summons)(EDC)
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Submitted (Mathews, Kellen)
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Submitted (Mathews, Kellen)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Cheryl B. Bella, Gayle A. Boudousquie, Michael A. Graham, Roland M. Hall, Timothy W. Hammett, Newton J. Landry, Clayton F. Lipscomb, Tommie E. McMorris, Sr.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Submitted (Mathews, Kellen)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Submitted (Mathews, Kellen)
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Submitted (Mathews, Kellen)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Submitted (Mathews, Kellen)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Submitted (Mathews, Kellen)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Mathews, Kellen)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Submitted (Mathews, Kellen)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Submitted (Mathews, Kellen)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 MOTION to Substitute Pleading. The clerk is directed to replace R. Doc. 1 with 2-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 10, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Substitute Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, Injunctive Relief and Damages and Attorney's Fees . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, Injunctive Relief and Damages and Attorney's Fees by iMortgage Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mathews, Kellen) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/10/2019) (EDC). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2019: #2 Proposed Pleading;) (EDC). Modified on 12/10/2019 to separate documents. (EDC).
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, Injunctive Relief and Damages and Attorney's Fees against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2043463.), filed by iMortgage Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- FTC Opinion and Order, #2 Exhibit B-Appraisal Ass'n Letter, #3 Exhibit C- FTC Complaint, #4 Attachment Cover Sheet)(Mathews, Kellen) Modified on 12/10/2019 to edit text. (EDC). (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/12/2019) (EDC). Modified on 12/12/2019 in accordance with record document 3. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: iMortgage Services LLC v. Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayle A Boudoquie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland M Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton F Lipscomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newton J Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board
Represented By: William Stephen Cannon
Represented By: Arlene C. Edwards
Represented By: Seth David Greenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommie E McMorris, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl B Bella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy W Hammett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newton J. Landry
Represented By: William Stephen Cannon
Represented By: Arlene C. Edwards
Represented By: Seth David Greenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommie E. McMorris, Sr.
Represented By: William Stephen Cannon
Represented By: Arlene C. Edwards
Represented By: Seth David Greenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy W. Hammett
Represented By: William Stephen Cannon
Represented By: Arlene C. Edwards
Represented By: Seth David Greenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland M. Hall
Represented By: William Stephen Cannon
Represented By: Arlene C. Edwards
Represented By: Seth David Greenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Graham
Represented By: William Stephen Cannon
Represented By: Arlene C. Edwards
Represented By: Seth David Greenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton F. Lipscomb
Represented By: William Stephen Cannon
Represented By: Arlene C. Edwards
Represented By: Seth David Greenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayle A. Boudousquie
Represented By: William Stephen Cannon
Represented By: Arlene C. Edwards
Represented By: Seth David Greenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl B. Bella
Represented By: William Stephen Cannon
Represented By: Arlene C. Edwards
Represented By: Seth David Greenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: iMortgage Services LLC
Represented By: Kellen James Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: iMortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Kellen James Mathews
Represented By: Justin Alan Jack
Represented By: Mark Raymond Beebe
Represented By: Robert Lewis Rieger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?