Levert et al v. Union Texas International Corporation et al
Plaintiff: James L. Sanford, August J. Levert Jr., Family LLC, Paul M. Levert, Campo E. Matens, Mark W. Levert, Jr., John E. Sanford and Ronald R. Levert
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Company, Union Texas International Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Nova Chemicals Olefins LLC and Key Production Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00852
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
2 Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support of #7 MOTION to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (SWE)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to #7 Remand. The clerk is directed to file R. Doc. 11-2 into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/5/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
February 5, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of #7 Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment proposed order, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Bartlett, Harvey) Modified on 2/5/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
February 5, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of #7 Motion to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
January 29, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Remand filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Carrizales, Claudia)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting, for good cause, the #8 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines and Delay Rule 26 Requirements Pending Ruling on #7 Remand Motion. The Scheduling Conference set for 1/30/2020 is CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/13/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines and Delay Rule 26 Requirements Pending Ruling on Remand Motion by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carrizales, Claudia) Modified on 1/10/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
January 10, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines and Delay Rule 26 Requirements Pending Ruling on Remand Motion. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
January 9, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1 through 1-H, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 1-I through 1-Q, #4 Exhibit Exhibits 1-R through 1-U, #5 Exhibit Exhibits 1-V through 1-CC)(Bartlett, Harvey)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation for Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Carrizales, Claudia)
December 26, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson. Judge John W. deGravelles no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Richfield Company, Union Texas International Corporation identifying Corporate Parent BP PLC for Atlantic Richfield Company, Union Texas International Corporation.. (Troutman, John)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nova Chemicals Olefins LLC. (Adkins, Paul)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/30/2020 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/11/2019. (KAH)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney George Arceneaux, III regarding Emily C. Borgen who is Co-Counsel for party Union Texas International Corporation and Atlantic Richfield Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (EDC)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 18th District Court of Louisiana, Case Number 45335. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2044349), filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Nova Chemicals Olefins LLC, Union Texas International Corporation, Key Production Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to the Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to the Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to the Removal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to the Removal, #5 Attachment Notice of Filing and Certificate of Removing Defendants, #6 Attachment State Court Copies 1, #7 Attachment State Court Copies 2, #8 Attachment State Court Copies 3, #9 Attachment State Court Copies 4, #10 Attachment State Court Copies 5, #11 Attachment State Court Copies 6, #12 Attachment State Court Copies 7, #13 Attachment State Court Copies 8, #14 Attachment Notice of Notice of Removal to Opposing Counsel, #15 Attachment Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to Clerk of Court for State Action, #16 Attachment Certificate of Notice, #17 Attachment Roster of Attorneys, #18 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Adkins, Paul) (Attachment 18 replaced on 12/11/2019) (EDC). Modified on 12/11/2019 to flatten document.(EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levert et al v. Union Texas International Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Company
Represented By: Paul M Adkins
Represented By: John Seth Troutman
Represented By: Court Charles VanTassell
Represented By: George Arceneaux, III
Represented By: Brittan Jackson Bush
Represented By: Penny Leonard Malbrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Texas International Corporation
Represented By: Paul M Adkins
Represented By: John Seth Troutman
Represented By: Court Charles VanTassell
Represented By: George Arceneaux, III
Represented By: Brittan Jackson Bush
Represented By: Penny Leonard Malbrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Paul M Adkins
Represented By: Louis Victor Gregoire, Jr.
Represented By: Claire Elizabeth Juneau
Represented By: Claudia Carrizales
Represented By: Michael R. Phillips
Represented By: John C Funderburk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nova Chemicals Olefins LLC
Represented By: Paul M Adkins
Represented By: Louis Edward Buatt
Represented By: Claudia Carrizales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key Production Company, Inc.
Represented By: Paul M Adkins
Represented By: David M. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Sanford
Represented By: Harvey S. Bartlett, III
Represented By: Lindsay E. Spann
Represented By: Bernard E. Boudreaux, Jr.
Represented By: John Thomas Arnold
Represented By: Eberhard D. Garrison
Represented By: Andrew Karl Jacoby
Represented By: Kevin Earl Huddell
Represented By: Emma E. Daschbach
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: August J. Levert Jr., Family LLC
Represented By: Harvey S. Bartlett, III
Represented By: Lindsay E. Spann
Represented By: Bernard E. Boudreaux, Jr.
Represented By: John Thomas Arnold
Represented By: Eberhard D. Garrison
Represented By: Andrew Karl Jacoby
Represented By: Kevin Earl Huddell
Represented By: Emma E. Daschbach
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul M. Levert
Represented By: Harvey S. Bartlett, III
Represented By: Lindsay E. Spann
Represented By: Bernard E. Boudreaux, Jr.
Represented By: John Thomas Arnold
Represented By: Eberhard D. Garrison
Represented By: Andrew Karl Jacoby
Represented By: Kevin Earl Huddell
Represented By: Emma E. Daschbach
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Campo E. Matens
Represented By: Harvey S. Bartlett, III
Represented By: Lindsay E. Spann
Represented By: Bernard E. Boudreaux, Jr.
Represented By: John Thomas Arnold
Represented By: Eberhard D. Garrison
Represented By: Andrew Karl Jacoby
Represented By: Kevin Earl Huddell
Represented By: Emma E. Daschbach
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark W. Levert, Jr.
Represented By: Harvey S. Bartlett, III
Represented By: Lindsay E. Spann
Represented By: Bernard E. Boudreaux, Jr.
Represented By: John Thomas Arnold
Represented By: Eberhard D. Garrison
Represented By: Andrew Karl Jacoby
Represented By: Kevin Earl Huddell
Represented By: Emma E. Daschbach
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Sanford
Represented By: Harvey S. Bartlett, III
Represented By: Lindsay E. Spann
Represented By: Bernard E. Boudreaux, Jr.
Represented By: John Thomas Arnold
Represented By: Eberhard D. Garrison
Represented By: Andrew Karl Jacoby
Represented By: Kevin Earl Huddell
Represented By: Emma E. Daschbach
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald R. Levert
Represented By: Harvey S. Bartlett, III
Represented By: Lindsay E. Spann
Represented By: Bernard E. Boudreaux, Jr.
Represented By: John Thomas Arnold
Represented By: Eberhard D. Garrison
Represented By: Andrew Karl Jacoby
Represented By: Kevin Earl Huddell
Represented By: Emma E. Daschbach
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?