United States of America v. Charter Home Health, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Charter Home Health, L.L.C., Wandell Ray Rogers and Jo Allyson Williams
Case Number: 3:2019cv00881
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zachary, Chase)
January 29, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Jo Allyson Williams waiver sent on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Zachary, Chase)
January 29, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Charter Home Health, L.L.C. waiver sent on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Zachary, Chase)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/5/2020 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 2/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/8/2020. (SGO)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Charter Home Health, L.L.C., Wandell Ray Rogers, Jo Allyson Williams. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Default Notice, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Charter Home Health, #5 Summons - Wandell Ray Rogers, #6 Summons - Jo Allyson Williams)(Zachary, Chase)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Charter Home Health, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Home Health, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wandell Ray Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Allyson Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Chase Evan Zachary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?