Mattress Direct, Inc. et al v. The Northern Insurance Company of New York et al
Plaintiff: Mattress Direct, Inc. and Mattress Direct of New Orleans, Inc.
Defendant: Southern Insurance Company and The Northern Insurance Company of New York
Case Number: 3:2019cv00883
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Mattress Direct, Inc., Mattress Direct of New Orleans, Inc., The Northern Insurance Company of New York, and Southern Insurance Company (Campbell, John) Modified on 2/11/2020 to edit the text (KAH).
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Mattress Direct of New Orleans, Inc., Mattress Direct, Inc., filed by Southern Insurance Company.(Mayberry, Meredith)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by The Northern Insurance Company of New York.(Bargas, Valerie)
January 13, 2020 Filing 4 Answer and Jury Demand by Southern Insurance Company. (Mayberry, Meredith) Modified on 1/13/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 2/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/6/2020. (SGO)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, on or before 1/21/2020, the removing defendant shall file an amended notice of removal providing the citizenship of plaintiff Mattress Direct, Inc. and Mattress Direct of New Orleans, Inc., by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/6/2020. (SGO)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 690895. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2049334), filed by Southern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Compliance with Requirement to Give Notice of Removal, #4 List of Attorneys and Parties in State Court Action, #5 Certificate of Filing of State Court Record, #6 Attachment Petition for Damages, #7 Attachment Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents, #8 Attachment Appendix 9.6 Louisiana Civil Case Reporting, #9 Attachment Citation to Southern Insurance Company, #10 Attachment Citation to The Northern Insurance Company of New York, #11 Attachment Service Return Southern Insurance Company, #12 Attachment Service Return The Northern Insurance Company of New York, #13 Attachment Service Return Fee Southern Insurance Company, #14 Attachment Service Return Fee The Northern Insurance Company of New York, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mayberry, Meredith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mattress Direct, Inc. et al v. The Northern Insurance Company of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mattress Direct, Inc.
Represented By: Colin Thomas Peak
Represented By: John Stone Campbell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mattress Direct of New Orleans, Inc.
Represented By: Colin Thomas Peak
Represented By: John Stone Campbell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Insurance Company
Represented By: Meredith A. Mayberry
Represented By: Rachal Chance Kramar
Represented By: James W. Hailey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Northern Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Valerie Briggs Bargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?