Stevens et al v. Vertiv Group Corporation
Plaintiff: Shermo Industries, Inc., Blake Stevens, Keith Mayeux, Jerhett Albert and Shermco Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Vertiv Group Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00885
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
2 Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE: Pursuant to General Order 2020-03, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(NLT)
February 18, 2020 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Damages by Vertiv Group Corporation.(Maraist, Catherine)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Michael R. Reed to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/4/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Eric A. Tate to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/4/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
February 3, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Michael R. Reed to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Vertiv Group Corporation (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2068910) by Vertiv Group Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Demmons, Larry)
February 3, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Eric Akira Tate to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing Fee $100.00 Receipt Number ALAMDC-206887) by Shermo Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Eric Akira Tate)(Pritt, Jacob) Modified on 2/3/2020 to add payment information.(EDC).
February 3, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #27 MOTION for Michael R. Reed to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Vertiv Group Corporation (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2068910), #26 MOTION for Eric Akira Tate to Appear Pro Hac Vice . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
January 31, 2020 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian A. Jackson: Telephone Conference held on 1/31/2020. Thomas Hubert, Michael Foley, P. J. Kee, and Eric Tate appear on behalf of Plaintiffs. Catherine Maraist and Michael Reed appear on behalf of Defendant. The Court notes that neither Mr. Tate or Mr. Reed are enrolled as counsel. The Court allows Mr. Tate to participate in this conference on behalf of the Plaintiffs and Mr. Reed to participate in this conference on behalf the Defendant and orders each to file Motions to Enroll as Counsel no later than 5:00 p.m. on Monday, February 3, 2020. The Motion for Contempt filed in the Ohio litigation and pending motions in this matter are discussed. Counsel for the Defendant shall update the Court regarding the status of the pending Motion for Contempt filed in the Ohio litigation. The Court will proceed with consideration of the motions pending in this matter. (Court Reporter N. Breaux.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH)
January 31, 2020 Filing 25 Ex Parte MOTION to Supplement #22 Motion to Set Status Conference by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Keith Mayeux)(Pritt, Jacob)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Status Conference Expedited Consideration Requested by All PlaintiffsTelephone Status Conference is set for 1/31/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the call to Counsel for Defendant and then to the Court at 225-389-3692. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/30/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH)
January 30, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #22 Ex Parte Motion to Set Status Conference filed by Vertiv Group Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Maraist, Catherine) Modified on 1/30/2020 to edit the text (KAH).
January 28, 2020 Filing 22 Ex Parte MOTION for Status Conference Expedited Consideration Requested by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Pritt, Jacob)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Exparte Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Peading pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(a) Vertiv Group Corporation responsive pleading due 2/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/17/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
January 16, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Vertiv Group Corporation. (Maraist, Catherine)
January 16, 2020 Filing 19 SUR-REPLY in Opposition to #4 MOTION to Transfer Venue and #16 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (Pritt, Jacob) Modified on 1/16/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE).
January 16, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
January 10, 2020 Filing 18 Joint STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Hubert, Thomas)
January 7, 2020 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #4 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by Jerhett Albert, Keith Mayeux, Shermco Industries, Inc., Blake Stevens. (NLT)
January 7, 2020 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian A. Jackson: Motion hearing regarding Plaintiffs'' Motion for Extension of TRO (doc. 7) and Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue (doc. 4). held on 1/7/2020. The Court grants Motion to enroll Catherine Maraist as co-counsel on behalf of the Defendant. The Court will not address the Motion to Transfer at this time. Counsel presents oral argument to the Court. Counsel shall meet and confer as to terms of TRO. Status Report shall be filed on or before the close of business on 1/10/2020. Counsel for Defendant withdraws Opposition (doc. 13) to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation. The Court grants Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation (doc. 12). The Court grants Plaintiffs request to file a Response to Defendant's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue. Response shall be limited in scope to the First-to-File Rule and shall not exceed 7 pages in length. (Court Reporter N. Breaux.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH) Modified on 1/10/2020 to edit text (PJH).
January 6, 2020 Filing 16 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support of #4 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by Vertiv Group Corporation. (Demmons, Larry)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Marc J. Kessler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/6/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
January 6, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Marc J. Kessler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2053353) by Vertiv Group Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Demmons, Larry)
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #12 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue in Excess of Page Limitation filed by Vertiv Group Corporation. (Demmons, Larry)
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Pritt, Jacob) Modified on 1/6/2020 to edit text (LT).
January 6, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 MOTION for Marc J. Kessler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2053353). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
January 3, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Briefs re; #4 Motion to Transfer Venue due by 1/6/2020. (LLH)
January 2, 2020 Filing 11 Notice to Counsel: Oral Argument regarding Motion for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order and to Set Hearing for Preliminary Injunction (doc. 7) filed by Plaintiffs and the Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue (doc. 4) is set for Tuesday, January 7, 2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Evidence, in electronic format, shall be provided in accordance with Local Rule 79 and Administrative Procedures.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(PJH)
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian A. Jackson: Telephone Conference held on 1/2/2020. The TRO signed December 23, 2019 by Judge Thomas Kliebert,Jr., 23rd Judicial District Court, and the Motion to Transfer Venue (doc. 4) filed by Defendant are discussed. Counsel agree to maintain status quo. Briefs, limited to 6 pages in length, regarding the Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue shall be filed on or before the close of business on Monday, January 6, 2020. The Court will issue a Notice to Counsel setting this matter for oral argument. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 Opposition to #5 MOTION for Oral Argument filed by All Plaintiffs. (Pritt, Jacob) Modified on 1/2/2020 to edit text (LT).
January 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Jerhett Albert, Blake Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Jerhett Albert, #4 Exhibit Albert Agreement, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Blake Stevens, #6 Exhibit Stevens Agreement)(Pritt, Jacob)
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order and to Set Hearing for Preliminary Injunction by Jerhett Albert, Keith Mayeux, Blake Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Amended Petition (State Court), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Mayeux Agreement, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Albert Agreement, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Stevens Agreement, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Cease and Desist Letter, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Cease and Desist)(Pritt, Jacob) Modified on 1/2/2020 to edit text (LT).
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Keith Mayeux. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Keith Mayeux)(Pritt, Jacob)
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Oral Argument on #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Ohio by Vertiv Group Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Demmons, Larry)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer Venue by Vertiv Group Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Demmons, Larry) Modified on 12/31/2019 to edit text (LT).
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Set Expedited Status Conference. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 1/2/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the call to Counsel for the Defendant then to the Court at 225-389-3692. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/30/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION and Incorporated Memorandum in Support to Set Status Conference Expedited Consideration Requested. by Jerhett Albert, Keith Mayeux, Shermo Industries, Inc., Blake Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court TRO, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Pritt, Jacob) Modified on 12/30/2019 to edit text (LT).
December 30, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 Ex Parte MOTION and Incorporated Memorandum in Support to Set Status Conference Expedited Consideration Requested.. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
December 30, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred: #2 Ex Parte MOTION and Incorporated Memorandum in Support to Set Status Conference Expedited Consideration Requested.. This motion is now pending before the USDJ. (LT)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd Judicial District Court, Case Number 127656. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2049775), filed by Vertiv Group Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Pleadings filed in State Court)(Demmons, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens et al v. Vertiv Group Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shermo Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Hubert
Represented By: Joseph F. Lavigne
Represented By: Jacob Jude Pritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Stevens
Represented By: Thomas P. Hubert
Represented By: Joseph F. Lavigne
Represented By: Jacob Jude Pritt
Represented By: P.J. Kee
Represented By: Michael Andrew Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Mayeux
Represented By: Thomas P. Hubert
Represented By: Joseph F. Lavigne
Represented By: Jacob Jude Pritt
Represented By: P.J. Kee
Represented By: Michael Andrew Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerhett Albert
Represented By: Thomas P. Hubert
Represented By: Joseph F. Lavigne
Represented By: Jacob Jude Pritt
Represented By: P.J. Kee
Represented By: Michael Andrew Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shermco Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Hubert
Represented By: Joseph F. Lavigne
Represented By: Jacob Jude Pritt
Represented By: Eric Akira Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vertiv Group Corporation
Represented By: Larry E. Demmons
Represented By: Marc J Kessler
Represented By: Catherine M. Maraist
Represented By: Michael R. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?