Capitol City Produce Company, LLC v. Sammy's Holding, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Capitol City Produce Company, LLC
Defendant: Sammy T. Nagem, S.C.C. of Baton Rouge, LLC and Sammy's Holding, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00030
Filed: January 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
2 Judge: Brian A Jackson
3 Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order (DCB)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINAL JUDGMENT: Plaintiff is entitled to a judgment in the amount set forth in this Court's Ruling and Order (Doc. 17). Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/10/20. (DCB)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULING AND ORDER granting #14 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/25/2020. (SWE)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF RECUSAL: Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick recused. Case reassigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/27/2020. (KMW)
August 27, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson. Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KMW)
March 4, 2020 Filing 15 Notice to Counsel: Considering this matter has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson, the Scheduling Conference set for 3/12/2020 is CANCELLED and will be reset at a later date. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
February 28, 2020 Filing 14 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Sammy Holdings, L.L.C., Creole Cabana and Sammy T. Nagem by Capitol City Produce Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Declaration of Devin Roy, #3 Attachment Exhibit 1 Of Devin Roy Declaration, #4 Attachment Exhibit 2 Of Devin Roy Declaration, #5 Attachment Exhibit 3 Of Devin Roy Declaration, #6 Attachment Exhibit 4 Of Devin Roy Declaration, #7 Attachment Exhibit 5 Of Devin Roy Declaration, #8 Attachment Exhibit 6 Of Devin Roy Declaration, #9 Attachment Exhibit 7 Part 1 Of Devin Roy Declaration, #10 Attachment Exhibit 7 Part 2 Of Devin Roy Declaration, #11 Attachment Exhibit 8 Of Devin Roy Declaration, #12 Attachment Exhibit 9 Of Devin Roy Declaration, #13 Attachment Exhibit 10 Of Devin Roy Declaration, #14 Attachment Exhibit 11 Of Devin Roy Declaration, #15 Attachment Mary Jean Fassett Declaration, #16 Attachment Exhibit 1 to Mary Jean Fassett Declaration, #17 Attachment Keary Everitt Declaration, #18 Attachment Exhibit to Keary Everitt Declaration)(Everitt, Keary) (Attachments 9-10, 16 & 18 replaced on 2/28/2020) (EDC). Modified on 2/28/2020 to rotate pages. (EDC).
February 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE: Pursuant to General Order 2020-03, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(DGM)
February 14, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to S.C.C. of Baton Rouge, LLC (KMW)
February 14, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sammy T. Nagem (KMW)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sammy's Holding, LLC (KMW)
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to S.C.C. of Baton Rouge, L.L.C. by Capitol City Produce Company, LLC. (Everitt, Keary)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Sammy T. Nagem by Capitol City Produce Company, LLC. (Everitt, Keary)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Sammy's Holdings, L.L.C., et al. by Capitol City Produce Company, LLC. (Everitt, Keary)
February 14, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capitol City Produce Company, LLC. Sammy T. Nagem served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (Everitt, Keary)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capitol City Produce Company, LLC. S.C.C. of Baton Rouge, LLC served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (Everitt, Keary)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capitol City Produce Company, LLC. Sammy's Holding, LLC served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (Everitt, Keary)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 2/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/24/2020. (SGO)
January 14, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sammy T. Nagem, S.C.C. of Baton Rouge, LLC, Sammy's Holding, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons)(EDC)
January 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2058769.), filed by Capitol City Produce Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons)(Everitt, Keary) Modified on 2/14/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capitol City Produce Company, LLC v. Sammy's Holding, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sammy T. Nagem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.C.C. of Baton Rouge, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sammy's Holding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol City Produce Company, LLC
Represented By: Keary L. Everitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?